IN SB0007 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-22 - Public Law 90
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Forensic nurses. Specifies requirements that a registered nurse must meet in order to practice as a forensic nurse. Requires biennial continuing education for a forensic nurse. Provides that a forensic nurse who is practicing as a forensic nurse on June 30, 2021, is not required to meet the biennial forensic nursing education requirements until June 30, 2023.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Forensic nurses.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-05 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 93 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-22SenatePublic Law 90
2021-04-22SenateSigned by the Governor
2021-04-21SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2021-04-13HouseSigned by the Speaker
2021-04-12SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2021-04-05SenateSenate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 341: yeas 47, nays 0
2021-04-01SenateSenator Randolph added as coauthor
2021-03-29SenateMotion to concur filed
2021-03-17HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2021-03-16HouseRepresentatives Ledbetter C, King J, Bauer M added as cosponsors
2021-03-16HouseRepresentative Vermilion A removed as cosponsor
2021-03-16HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 263: yeas 93, nays 3
2021-03-15HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2021-03-11HouseRepresentative Vermilion A added as cosponsor
2021-03-11HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2021-02-23HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Public Health
2021-02-10SenateReferred to the House
2021-02-09SenateSenators Becker, Breaux, Melton added as coauthors
2021-02-09SenateSenator Charbonneau added as second author
2021-02-09SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Olthoff
2021-02-09SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 77: yeas 47, nays 0
2021-02-08SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2021-02-04SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2021-01-07SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services
2021-01-07SenateAuthored by Senator Crider

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2021/bills/senate/7/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/5/f/7/35f71a3f/SB0007.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/2/8/9/c289ca4d/SB0007.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/3/8/e/438e3b44/SB0007.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/2/7/1/a2713a88/SB0007.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/a/1/4/6a14b16a/SB0007.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/4/4/3/0443ea73/SB0007.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/7/f/9/37f90a30/SB0007.04.ENRH.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/6/3/1/66315c31/SB0007.01.INTR.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/f/3/d/3f3d3876/SB0007.01.INTR.CRS001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/b/d/2/5bd2f2cf/SB0007.02.COMS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/4/a/d/14ad660c/SB0007.02.COMS.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/2/b/3/12b30894/SB0007.02.COMS.FN003.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/7/7/2/3772e4fa/SB0007.03.COMH.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/9/3/7/a9372ae6/SB0007.02.COMS.CRH001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/6/b/1/b6b149b0/SB0007.03.COMH.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/0/9/4/60945a48/SB0007.03.COMH.FN003.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/1/3/d/013d6613/SB0007.03.COMH.CON01.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/3/7/b/b37b4557/SB0007.04.ENRH.FN001.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/0/f/5/30f56ebe/SB0007.01.INTR.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/3/5/e/635ec4d4/SB0007.77_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/6/a/6/66a610a8/SB0007.02.COMS.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/4/2/5/1425f17f/SB0007.263_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/d/3/1/ad31089a/SB0007.341_S.pdf

Bill Comments 750

feedback