IN SB0006 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 57-32)
Status: Passed on April 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-01 - Public Law 4
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

State house monument to suffragists. Extends the Indiana women's suffrage centennial commission (IWSCC) until July 1, 2024. Requires the IWSCC to commission the creation of a suitable monument to the people of Indiana active in the women's suffrage movement and the ratification of the Nineteenth Amendment to the Constitution of the United States. Requires the department of administration to install the monument commissioned by the IWSCC on the grounds of the state house before January 1, 2024.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State house monument to suffragists.

Sponsors

Sen. Susan Glick [R]Sen. Jean Breaux [D]Sen. Vaneta Becker [R]Sen. Fady Qaddoura [D]
Sen. Ronnie Alting [R]Sen. Philip Boots [R]Sen. Jon Ford [R]Sen. Chris Garten [R]
Sen. Ronald Grooms [R]Sen. David Niezgodski [D]Sen. Karen Tallian [D]Sen. Linda Rogers [R]
Rep. Sharon Negele [R]Rep. Cherrish Pryor [D]Rep. David Abbott [R]Rep. Mike Andrade [D]
Rep. Terri Jo Austin [D]Rep. Beau Baird [R]Rep. Bradford Barrett [R]Rep. John Bartlett [D]
Rep. Maureen Bauer [D]Rep. Chris Campbell [D]Rep. Robert Cherry [R]Rep. Edward Clere [R]
Rep. Anthony Cook [R]Rep. Steven Davisson [R]Rep. Edward DeLaney [D]Rep. Sean Eberhart [R]
Rep. Jeff Ellington [R]Rep. Karen Engleman [R]Rep. Rita Fleming [D]Rep. Randall Frye [R]
Rep. Philip GiaQuinta [D]Rep. Doug Gutwein [R]Rep. Earl Harris [D]Rep. Ragen Hatcher [D]
Rep. Ryan Hatfield [D]Rep. Dave Heine [R]Rep. Blake Johnson [D]Rep. Michael Karickhoff [R]
Rep. Joanna King [R]Rep. Ryan Lauer [R]Rep. Cindy Ledbetter [R]Rep. Donald Lehe [R]
Rep. Matthew Lehman [R]Rep. Daniel Leonard [R]Rep. Shane Lindauer [R]Rep. Ethan Manning [R]
Rep. Chris May [R]Rep. Peggy Mayfield [R]Rep. Wendy McNamara [R]Rep. Robert Morris [R]
Rep. Charles Moseley [D]Rep. Julie Olthoff [R]Rep. Renee Pack [D]Rep. Elizabeth Rowray [R]
Rep. Donna Schaibley [R]Rep. Harold Slager [R]Rep. Ben Smaltz [R]Rep. Vernon Smith [D]
Rep. Craig Snow [R]Rep. Edmond Soliday [R]Rep. Gregory Steuerwald [R]Rep. Holli Sullivan [R]
Rep. Jake Teshka [R]Rep. Jeffrey Thompson [R]Rep. Heath VanNatter [R]Rep. Ann Vermilion [R]
Rep. Dennis Zent [R]Rep. Cindy Ziemke [R]Rep. Michelle Davis [R]Rep. Micheal Aylesworth [R]
Rep. Jim Lucas [R]Rep. Timothy Wesco [R]Rep. Doug Miller [R]Rep. Martin Carbaugh [R]
Rep. Pat Boy [D]Rep. Sue Errington [D]Rep. Mitch Gore [D]Rep. Carey Hamilton [D]
Rep. Carolyn Jackson [D]Rep. Sheila Klinker [D]Rep. Justin Moed [D]Rep. Tonya Pfaff [D]
Rep. Matt Pierce [D]Rep. Gregory Porter [D]Rep. Robin Shackleford [D]Rep. Vanessa Summers [D]
Rep. Chuck Goodrich [R]

Roll Calls

2021-03-16 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-01SenatePublic Law 4
2021-04-01SenateSigned by the Governor
2021-03-31SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2021-03-23HouseSigned by the Speaker
2021-03-18SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2021-03-17HouseReturned to the Senate without amendments
2021-03-16HouseRepresentative Goodrich added as cosponsor
2021-03-16HouseRepresentatives Boy, Errington, Gore M, Hamilton, Jackson, Klinker, Moed, Pfaff, Pierce, Porter, Shackleford, Summers added as cosponsors
2021-03-16HouseRepresentative Carbaugh added as cosponsor
2021-03-16HouseRepresentative Miller added as cosponsor
2021-03-16HouseRepresentatives Davis M, Aylesworth, Lucas, Wesco added as cosponsors
2021-03-16HouseRepresentatives Abbott D, Andrade M, Austin, Baird, Barrett, Bartlett, Bauer M, Campbell, Cherry, Clere, Cook, Davisson, DeLaney, Eberhart, Ellington, Engleman, Fleming, Frye, GiaQuinta, Gutwein, Harris, Hatcher, Hatfield, Heine, Johnson, Karickhoff, King J, Lauer, Ledbetter C, Lehe, Lehman, Leonard, Lindauer, Manning, May, Mayfield, McNamara, Morris, Moseley, Olthoff, Pack R, Rowray E, Schaibley, Slager, Smaltz, Smith, V., Snow C, Soliday, Steuerwald, Sullivan, Teshka J, Thompson, VanNatter, Vermilion A, Zent, Ziemke added as cosponsors
2021-03-16HouseRule 105.1 suspended
2021-03-16HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 262: yeas 97, nays 0
2021-03-15HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2021-03-11HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2021-02-23HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform
2021-02-10SenateReferred to the House
2021-02-09SenateSenators Niezgodski, Tallian, Rogers added as coauthors
2021-02-09SenateSenators Alting, Boots, Ford Jon, Garten, Grooms added as coauthors
2021-02-09SenateSenator Becker added as third author
2021-02-09SenateCosponsor: Representative Pryor
2021-02-09SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Negele
2021-02-09SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 76: yeas 47, nays 0
2021-02-08SenateSenator Qaddoura added as coauthor
2021-02-08SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2021-02-04SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2021-01-07SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy
2021-01-07SenateAuthored by Senators Glick and Breaux

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2021/bills/senate/6/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/7/b/2/27b20d09/SB0006.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/8/4/e/684e5e80/SB0006.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/b/f/f/3bfff595/SB0006.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/b/f/4/dbf4f261/SB0006.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/a/b/9/dab9c30b/SB0006.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/d/4/7/4d479529/SB0006.04.ENRH.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/f/0/f/2f0f6fa4/SB0006.01.INTR.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/3/4/3/03435eba/SB0006.01.INTR.CRS001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/2/0/8/420826c8/SB0006.02.COMS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/b/3/9/cb392578/SB0006.02.COMS.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/c/a/5/3ca56189/SB0006.02.COMS.FN003.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/8/a/1/48a1a48d/SB0006.02.COMS.CRH001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/7/0/1/77017fd5/SB0006.03.COMH.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/a/9/d/ea9dbbe7/SB0006.03.COMH.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/2/c/0/f2c0e4e4/SB0006.03.COMH.FN003.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/5/9/0/c59044bf/SB0006.04.ENRH.FN001.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/6/e/3/06e3d669/SB0006.01.INTR.02.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/e/6/2/de623a9d/SB0006.76_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/e/0/9/4e097e17/SB0006.02.COMS.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/2/b/3/72b37f76/SB0006.262_H.pdf

Bill Comments 750

feedback