IN SB0006 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 207
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 207
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Child support.
Title
Child support.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-24 - House - House - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - Senate - Senate - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-18 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - Senate - Senate - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-18 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-13 | House | Public Law 207 |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2013-04-26 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2013-04-24 | House | Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House; Roll Call 589: yeas 97, nays 0 |
2013-04-24 | House | Rules suspended |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 513: yeas 49, nays 0 |
2013-04-09 | House | House advisors appointed: Washburne, McMillin, Macer and Summers |
2013-04-09 | House | House conferees appointed: Steuerwald and Dvorak |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Senate advisors appointed: Holdman, Hume and Bray |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Senate conferee appointed: Steele and Randolph |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Senate dissented from House amendments |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Concurrence withdrawn |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Motion to concur in House amendments filed |
2013-03-18 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2013-03-18 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 270: yeas 92, nays 0 |
2013-03-14 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2013-03-12 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2013-02-26 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Cosponsors: Reps. McMillin and Koch |
2013-02-11 | Senate | House sponsor: Rep. Steuerwald |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 88: yeas 48 and nays 0 |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Amendment 2 (Tallian), prevailed; voice vote |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Amendment 1 (Steele), prevailed; voice vote |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2013-01-15 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2013-01-07 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2013-01-07 | Senate | Authored by Senators Steele and Tallian |