IN SB0006 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-6)
Status: Passed on May 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-18 - Effective 05/09/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-6)
Status: Passed on May 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-18 - Effective 05/09/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the state and local units of government to enter into agreements to provide interstate mutual aid for emergency responses that do not rise to the level requiring a state or local declaration of a state of emergency or disaster. Recognizes certain out-of-state professional licenses, certifications, or other permits when the state or a political subdivision requests mutual aid from jurisdictions outside of Indiana. Provides immunity from civil liability to certain persons acting under such mutual aid agreements. Specifies that emergency responders from outside Indiana rendering mutual aid within Indiana under such mutual aid agreements remain employees and agents of their respective employers and jurisdictions. Provides that benefits enjoyed by emergency responders rendering mutual aid under such mutual aid agreements shall extend to the services the emergency responders perform outside their respective jurisdictions as if those services had been rendered in their own jurisdiction. Requires such mutual aid agreements to be approved in the same manner as interlocal cooperation agreements are approved.
Title
Interstate mutual aid agreements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-19 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-18 | Effective 05/09/2011 | |
2011-05-17 | Public Law 94 | |
2011-05-09 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-02 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2011-04-27 | Signed by the Speaker | |
2011-04-26 | Signed by the President Pro Tempore | |
2011-04-19 | Returned to the Senate without amendments | |
2011-04-19 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 557: yeas 92, nays 0 | |
2011-04-18 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2011-04-12 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | |
2011-04-04 | Representative Yarde added as cosponsor | |
2011-03-28 | First reading: referred to Committee on Veterans Affairs and Public Safety | |
2011-02-08 | Cosponsor: Rep. Wesco | |
2011-02-08 | House sponsor: Rep. Neese | |
2011-02-08 | Referred to the House | |
2011-02-08 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 78: yeas 48 and nays 0 | |
2011-01-31 | Senators Glick, Yoder, Skinner, Wyss, Kruse, Broden, Banks, Charbonneau, Becker, Mrvan and Grooms added as coauthors | |
2011-01-31 | Senator Hume added as coauthor | |
2011-01-31 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2011-01-27 | Senators R. Young and Tomes added as coauthors | |
2011-01-27 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | |
2011-01-13 | Senator Smith added as coauthor | |
2011-01-10 | Senator Landske added as coauthor | |
2011-01-10 | Senator Arnold added as second author | |
2011-01-06 | Committee report: amended, reassigned to Committee on Local Government | |
2011-01-05 | First reading: referred to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedure | |
2011-01-05 | Authored by Senator Zakas |