IN SB0005 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 37-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-10 - Public Law 219
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 37-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-10 - Public Law 219
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Local health departments; public health emergencies. Provides that if a local order addresses an aspect of a declared emergency addressed by an executive order, the local order may be less stringent than the executive order to the extent permitted by the executive order. Provides that if a local order addresses an aspect of a declared emergency that is not addressed by an executive order or if a local order addresses an aspect of a declared emergency more stringently than an executive order, the local order may not take effect, or remain in effect, unless the local order is approved by the county legislative body (in the case of a county health department) or by an ordinance adopted by the city legislative body and approved by the mayor (in the case of a city health department). Provides that the appointment of a county health officer is subject to the approval of the county legislative body. Adds other good cause to the reasons for which a local health officer may be removed in counties other than Marion County. Specifies that a local health officer serves until a successor is appointed and qualified. Establishes an appeals process before legislative bodies of enforcement actions taken by local boards of health and local health officers in response to declared state and local public health emergencies.
Title
Local health departments; public health emergencies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-10 - House - House - Veto overridden by the House (Y: 59 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Senate - Veto overridden by the Senate (Y: 36 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 2 (Y: 65 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 2 (Y: 37 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 65 N: 28 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 40 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Senate - Veto overridden by the Senate (Y: 36 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 2 (Y: 65 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 2 (Y: 37 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 65 N: 28 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 40 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-10 | Senate | Public Law 219 |
2021-05-10 | House | Veto overridden by the House; Roll Call 516: yeas 59, nays 30 |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Veto overridden by the Senate; Roll Call 502: yeas 36, nays 10 |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-04-28 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2021-04-21 | House | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 2: adopted by the House; Roll Call 495: yeas 65, nays 29 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 2: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 479: yeas 37, nays 12 |
2021-04-21 | House | CCR # 2 filed in the House |
2021-04-21 | Senate | CCR # 2 filed in the Senate |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Motion to withdraw CCR #1: prevailed |
2021-04-19 | House | CCR # 1 filed in the House |
2021-04-19 | House | Representative Clere added as conferee |
2021-04-19 | House | Representative Pierce removed as conferee |
2021-04-19 | House | Representative Clere removed as advisor |
2021-04-19 | Senate | CCR # 1 filed in the Senate |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Senator Ford Jon removed as coauthor |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Senator Crane added as conferee |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Senator Tallian removed as conferee |
2021-04-13 | House | Representative Pierce added as conferee |
2021-04-13 | House | Representative Austin removed as conferee |
2021-04-13 | House | Representative Pierce removed as advisor |
2021-04-12 | House | House advisors appointed: Clere, Morrison, Pierce and Fleming |
2021-04-12 | House | House conferees appointed: Lehman and Austin |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Senate advisors appointed: Messmer, Breaux and Alting |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Senate conferees appointed: Garten and Tallian |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Senate dissented from House amendments |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Motion to dissent filed |
2021-04-07 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2021-04-06 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 363: yeas 65, nays 28 |
2021-04-05 | House | Amendment #1 (Morris) failed; Division of the House: yeas 32, nays 59 |
2021-04-05 | House | Amendment #12 (Jacob) ruled out of order |
2021-04-05 | House | Amendment #2 (Lehman) prevailed; voice vote |
2021-04-05 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2021-04-01 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2021-03-01 | House | Representative Clere added as cosponsor |
2021-02-23 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedures |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Cosponsor: Representative Morrison |
2021-02-08 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Lehman |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 65: yeas 40, nays 8 |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Amendment #4 (Tallian) failed; voice vote |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Amendment #2 (Garten) prevailed; voice vote |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2021-01-07 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy |
2021-01-07 | Senate | Coauthored by Senators Doriot, Zay, Holdman, Houchin, Baldwin, Sandlin, Buchanan, Koch, Perfect, Rogers, Brown L, Buck, Leising, Charbonneau, Raatz, Tomes, Freeman, Bassler, Niemeyer, Young M, Crane, Boots, Ford Jon, Gaskill, Walker G, Busch, Walker K, Donato, Glick, Grooms, Kruse, Bohacek |
2021-01-07 | Senate | Authored by Senators Garten, Alting, Messmer |