IN SB0004 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on March 4 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-03-05 - House advisors appointed: Barrett, Schaibley and Fleming
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Health programs. Extends the prohibition against the inclusion of certain Medicaid recipients in: (1) risk based managed care programs; or (2) capitated managed care programs; from June 30, 2020, to June 30, 2021. Requires a syringe exchange program to: (1) provide testing for communicable diseases and provide services or a referral for services if the individual tests positive; and (2) establish a referral process for program participants in need of information or education concerning communicable diseases or health care. Requires the state department of health to include certain information concerning syringe exchange programs in the report to the general assembly before November 1, 2020. Extends the expiration date for certain syringe exchange programs from July 1, 2021, to July 1, 2022.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health programs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-03 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 82 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-05HouseHouse advisors appointed: Barrett, Schaibley and Fleming
2020-03-05HouseHouse conferees appointed: Kirchhofer and Shackleford
2020-03-05SenateSenate advisors appointed: Zay, Randolph Lonnie M, Breaux and Ruckelshaus
2020-03-05SenateSenate conferees appointed: Charbonneau and Melton
2020-03-05SenateSenate dissented from House amendments
2020-03-05SenateMotion to dissent filed
2020-03-04HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2020-03-03HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 265: yeas 82, nays 12
2020-03-02HouseRepresentative Shackleford added as cosponsor
2020-03-02HouseRepresentative Clere added as cosponsor
2020-03-02HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2020-02-27HouseRepresentative Schaibley added as cosponsor
2020-02-27HouseRepresentative Kirchhofer removed as cosponsor
2020-02-27HouseRepresentative Kirchhofer added as sponsor
2020-02-27HouseRepresentative Schaibley removed as sponsor
2020-02-27HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2020-02-04HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Public Health
2020-01-29SenateReferred to the House
2020-01-28SenateCosponsor: Representative Kirchhofer
2020-01-28SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Schaibley
2020-01-28SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 94: yeas 47, nays 3
2020-01-27SenateSenator Randolph added as coauthor
2020-01-27SenateSenator Glick added as coauthor
2020-01-27SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2020-01-23SenateSenator Ruckelshaus added as second author
2020-01-23SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2020-01-16SenateSenator Stoops added as coauthor
2020-01-16SenateSenator Melton added as coauthor
2020-01-16SenateCommittee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations
2020-01-06SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services
2020-01-06SenateAuthored by Senator Charbonneau

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2020/bills/senate/4/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/7/1/c/071c5c59/SB0004.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/c/2/0/8c20d91f/SB0004.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/0/a/7/20a701dd/SB0004.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/c/d/e/6cdea5a8/SB0004.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/9/f/e/99fe8bb1/SB0004.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/d/c/4/adc4ab51/SB0004.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/a/5/5/1a554d59/SB0004.04.COMH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/a/5/3/3a534059/SB0004.01.INTR.02.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/7/5/9/c759622e/SB0004.02.COMS.02.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/b/b/9/5bb92900/SB0004.94_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/2/7/d/627d8977/SB0004.03.COMS.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/0/1/c/201cd902/SB0004.265_H.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback