IN SB0004 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-7)
Status: Passed on April 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-10 - Public Law 15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-7)
Status: Passed on April 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-10 - Public Law 15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Water and wastewater utilities and runoff. Establishes a storm water management task force to study issues related to storm water management systems. Provides for the task force to consist of: (1) two members of the senate; (2) two members of the house; and (3) other members appointed by the governor. Requires the task force to issue a report setting forth its findings and recommendations not later than December 1, 2019. Provides that the Indiana finance authority (IFA) shall coordinate the executive branch activities related to the state's water programs. Prescribes the duties of the authority in serving in this role. Requires the IFA to divide Indiana into study areas and to hold annual meetings with the officers and employees of the water and wastewater utilities located in each study area. Authorizes the utilities within a study area to meet voluntarily to determine area water and wastewater priorities, promote cooperation among the utilities, and consider other matters. Requires biennial reports from the utilities of each study area and from the IFA on the cooperative activities of the utilities. Provides that a utility applying to the IFA for a loan, a grant, or other financial assistance must demonstrate that its officers and employees have participated in study area activities. Requires every water utility, at least once in each calendar year, to perform an audit of its water distribution system to determine the causes of the water utility's "non-revenue water" (the difference between the amount of water entering the utility's distribution system and the amount of water received by the water utility's customers). In even-numbered years, requires the results of the annual audit to be verified by an independent evaluator and reported to the IFA and requires the IFA to issue a report concerning the audit results. Specifies that: (1) customer specific data, including information excluded from public access under Indiana's access to public records act; and (2) a required cybersecurity plan; submitted in connection with an application for a permit for a public water system or a wastewater treatment plant is exempt from the requirement that certain required analyses and plans must be made publicly available. Amends the definition of "customer lead service line improvement".
Title
Water and wastewater utilities and runoff. Establishes a storm water management task force to study issues related to storm water management systems. Provides for the task force to consist of: (1) two members of the senate; (2) two members of the house; and (3) other members appointed by the governor. Requires the task force to issue a report setting forth its findings and recommendations not later than December 1, 2019. Provides that the Indiana finance authority (IFA) shall coordinate the executive branch activities related to the state's water programs. Prescribes the duties of the authority in serving in this role. Requires the IFA to divide Indiana into study areas and to hold annual meetings with the officers and employees of the water and wastewater utilities located in each study area. Authorizes the utilities within a study area to meet voluntarily to determine area water and wastewater priorities, promote cooperation among the utilities, and consider other matters. Requires biennial reports from the utilities of each study area and from the IFA on the cooperative activities of the utilities. Provides that a utility applying to the IFA for a loan, a grant, or other financial assistance must demonstrate that its officers and employees have participated in study area activities. Requires every water utility, at least once in each calendar year, to perform an audit of its water distribution system to determine the causes of the water utility's "non-revenue water" (the difference between the amount of water entering the utility's distribution system and the amount of water received by the water utility's customers). In even-numbered years, requires the results of the annual audit to be verified by an independent evaluator and reported to the IFA and requires the IFA to issue a report concerning the audit results. Specifies that: (1) customer specific data, including information excluded from public access under Indiana's access to public records act; and (2) a required cybersecurity plan; submitted in connection with an application for a permit for a public water system or a wastewater treatment plant is exempt from the requirement that certain required analyses and plans must be made publicly available. Amends the definition of "customer lead service line improvement".
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-10 | Senate | Public Law 15 |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-04-02 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 336: yeas 48, nays 0 |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Motion to concur filed |
2019-03-15 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2019-03-14 | House | Representative Manning added as cosponsor |
2019-03-14 | House | Rule 105.1 suspended |
2019-03-14 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 313: yeas 93, nays 0 |
2019-03-12 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2019-03-11 | House | Representatives Pierce and Hatfield added as cosponsors |
2019-03-07 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2019-02-26 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Utilities, Energy and Telecommunications |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Senator Spartz added as coauthor |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Senator Buck added as coauthor |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Cosponsor: Representative Hamilton |
2019-01-28 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Soliday |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 34: yeas 48, nays 0 |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Senators Leising, Zay, Stoops, Ford J.D., Perfect, Doriot, Garten added as coauthors |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Senator Houchin added as coauthor |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Senators Merritt and Koch added as coauthors |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Senator Niezgodski added as third author |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Senator Glick added as second author |
2019-01-10 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Utilities |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Authored by Senator Charbonneau |