IN SB0004 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-27 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Allows the manager of a public use airport, or the manager's designee, to chase or take at any time, without a hunting license, a white-tailed deer, coyote, wild turkey, or migratory bird that poses a threat to aircraft within the airport operations area. Requires a manager of a public use airport, or the manager's designee, to report annually to the department of natural resources certain information concerning the animals killed on the airport's property. Requires a manager of a public use airport, or the manager's designee, to obtain a permit to chase or take a wild animal if the manager or the manager's designee does not comply with the reporting requirement.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Natural resources matters.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-03-13 - Senate - Senate - Conference Committee Report 1 adopted (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 adopted (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - House - House Floor - (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - House Committee on Natural Resources - Roll Call 000403 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-01-27 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-01-13 - Senate - Senate Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources - Roll Call 000401 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-27SenateSigned by the Governor
2014-03-26SenatePublic Law 194
2014-03-18SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2014-03-14SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2014-03-14HouseSigned by the Speaker
2014-03-13SenateConference Committee Report 1 adopted; Roll Call 407: yeas 46 and nays 0
2014-03-12HouseRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 adopted; Roll Call 468: yeas 95 and nays 0
2014-03-10HouseRepresentative Stemler added as advisor
2014-03-10HouseRepresentative McMillin added as advisor
2014-03-10HouseRepresentative Heaton added as advisor
2014-03-10HouseRepresentative Kersey added as conferee
2014-03-10HouseRepresentative Frye added as conferee
2014-03-06SenateSenator Glick added as advisor
2014-03-06SenateSenator Crider added as advisor
2014-03-06SenateSenator R. Young added as advisor
2014-03-06SenateSenator Kruse added as advisor
2014-03-06SenateSenator Hume added as conferee
2014-03-06SenateSenator Steele added as conferee
2014-03-06SenateSenate dissented from House amendments
2014-03-06SenateMotion to Withdraw Concurrence: prevailed
2014-03-05SenateSenator Banks added as third author.
2014-03-03HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2014-03-03HouseThird reading: Passed: Roll Call 371: yeas 97 and nays 1
2014-02-27HouseSB 4 Amendment #1 (Eberhart), prevailed.
2014-02-27HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed.
2014-02-24HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted.
2014-02-24HouseRepresentative Ober added as cosponsor.
2014-02-04HouseFirst Reading: Referred to Natural Resources
2014-01-28SenateRepresentative Frye added as sponsor.
2014-01-28SenateRepresentative Heaton added as cosponsor.
2014-01-27SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 48: yeas 47 and nays 0
2014-01-27SenateReferred to the House
2014-01-27SenateSenator Kruse added as second author.
2014-01-23SenateReread second time amended and ordered engrossed
2014-01-23SenateAmendment #1 (Steele), prevailed.
2014-01-21SenateReturned to second reading
2014-01-16SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2014-01-14SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted.
2014-01-07SenateFirst Reading: Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources
2014-01-07SenateAuthored by Senator Steele

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2014/bills/senate/4/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/6/1/f/061f045e/SB0004.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/8/f/b/a8fb88f1/SB0004.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/6/7/6/7676275b/SB0004.03.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/8/c/0/e8c042bd/SB0004.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/4/2/5/3425bd2c/SB0004.03.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/b/e/9/dbe961be/SB0004.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/f/f/7/cff77429/SB0004.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/4/7/d/a47de70a/SB0004.05.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/1/1/e/011efc22/SB0004.05.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/b/a/9/3ba9ae78/SB0004.06.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/2/d/a/82dad81b/SB0004.01.INTR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/2/a/3/82a3956e/SB0004.03.ENGS.48.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/2/7/3/e2732b17/SB0004.03.ENGS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/c/9/d/4c9de357/SB0004.05.ENGH.371.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/8/5/4/68542f85/SB0004.05.ENGH.468.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/a/d/0/1ad06e26/SB0004.05.ENGH.407.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback