IN SB0003 | 2022 | 1st Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 17-1)
Status: Engrossed on August 1 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-08-01 - First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on August 1 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-08-01 - First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Tax and fiscal matters. Provides that the gasoline use tax rate during the period beginning on the first day following the enactment into law of the bill and continuing through June 30, 2023, is capped at $0.295 per gallon. Provides, however, that if the gasoline use tax rate as determined under current law for a month is less than $0.295 per gallon, the lesser tax rate shall apply. Provides a temporary sales tax exemption for six monthly billing cycles during which the sale of utilities to residential customers and the sale of intrastate telecommunication services to residential customers are exempt from the state sales tax. Defines "residential customer" for purposes of the exemption. Requires the power subsidiary or person that furnishes or sells the services to provide to each customer on the customer's billing statement a notice that the state sales tax that otherwise would be applied is not applied in accordance with the enactment of the bill. Freezes the gasoline excise tax and the special fuel tax rates beginning on the first day following the enactment into law of the bill and continuing through June 30, 2023, at the rates that were in effect on June 30, 2022. Eliminates the annual index factor during this period. Specifies that beginning July 1, 2023, the tax rates shall be determined as if the rates had not been frozen during the 2023 state fiscal year. Appropriates $17,700,000 from the state general fund to the auditor of state to make transfers to counties, cities, and towns equal to the amount of gasoline excise tax and special fuel tax that each county, city, and town would have otherwise received if the rates had not been frozen during the 2023 state fiscal year. Requires the revenue transferred to the counties, cities, and towns to be used for the purposes for which revenue from those tax rates may be used under applicable law. Appropriates an amount for transfer to the capital reserve account after June 30, 2023, based on a determination by the budget agency of the difference between: (1) $1,000,000,000; and (2) the actual fiscal impact to the state of Indiana in state fiscal year 2023 as a result of the enactment of certain provisions being proposed in Senate Bill 2 and Senate Bill 3. Appropriates $400,000,000 from the state general fund to the budget agency for transfer to the pension stabilization fund for the purposes of the pension stabilization fund.
Title
Tax and fiscal matters.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-07-30 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 40 N: 4 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-07-29 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #8 (Melton) failed (Y: 9 N: 36 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-07-29 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #7 (Lanane) failed (Y: 10 N: 37 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-07-29 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #4 (Qaddoura) failed (Y: 10 N: 37 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-07-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-07-29 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #8 (Melton) failed (Y: 9 N: 36 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-07-29 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #7 (Lanane) failed (Y: 10 N: 37 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-07-29 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #4 (Qaddoura) failed (Y: 10 N: 37 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-07-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-01 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2022-08-01 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2022-07-30 | Senate | Cosponsor: Representative Lehman |
2022-07-30 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Brown T |
2022-07-30 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 54: yeas 40, nays 4 |
2022-07-29 | Senate | Senators Rogers, Doriot, Kruse, Sandlin, Raatz, Gaskill, Boehnlein, Boots, Buchanan, Crane, Baldwin, Walker K added as coauthors |
2022-07-29 | Senate | Senator Mishler added as coauthor |
2022-07-29 | Senate | Senator Garten added as second author |
2022-07-29 | Senate | Senator Garten removed as coauthor |
2022-07-29 | Senate | Senator Mishler removed as second author |
2022-07-29 | Senate | Amendment #8 (Melton) failed; Roll Call 51: yeas 9, nays 36 |
2022-07-29 | Senate | Amendment #7 (Lanane) failed; Roll Call 50: yeas 10, nays 37 |
2022-07-29 | Senate | Amendment #4 (Qaddoura) failed; Roll Call 49: yeas 10, nays 37 |
2022-07-29 | Senate | Amendment #2 (Holdman) prevailed; voice vote |
2022-07-29 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Holdman) prevailed; voice vote |
2022-07-29 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2022-07-27 | Senate | Senator Melton added as coauthor |
2022-07-27 | Senate | Senator Garten added as coauthor |
2022-07-27 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2022-07-25 | Senate | Senator Mishler added as second author |
2022-07-25 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2022-07-25 | Senate | Authored by Senator Holdman |