IN SB0003 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-3)
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-10 - First reading: referred to Committee on Insurance
Pending: House Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Health care provider billing. Prohibits billing a patient who receives emergency services: (1) from an out of network provider; and (2) at specified facilities that are in network; for amounts that exceed the cost paid by the patient's insurance plus any deductibles, copayments, and coinsurance amounts. Requires certain health care providers to provide, upon request from the patient, a good faith estimate to the patient for the cost of care at least five business days before a health care service or procedure is provided. Sets forth requirements of the good faith estimate. Requires the patient to acknowledge in writing receipt of the estimate and indicate whether to proceed with the service or procedure.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health care provider billing.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-10HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Insurance
2020-02-05SenateReferred to the House
2020-02-04SenateSenator Rogers added as coauthor
2020-02-04SenateSenators Kruse and Messmer added as coauthors
2020-02-04SenateCosponsors: Representatives Kirchhofer and Barrett
2020-02-04SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Smaltz
2020-02-04SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 133: yeas 49, nays 0
2020-02-03SenateSenator Zay added as coauthor
2020-02-03SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2020-01-27SenateSenator Randolph added as coauthor
2020-01-27SenateSenator Glick added as coauthor
2020-01-23SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2020-01-16SenateSenator Stoops added as coauthor
2020-01-16SenateSenator Melton added as coauthor
2020-01-09SenateSenator Ford Jon added as third author
2020-01-06SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services
2020-01-06SenateAuthored by Senators Charbonneau and Garten

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback