IN SB0003 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-11 - Representatives Zent and Bartels added as cosponsors
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-11 - Representatives Zent and Bartels added as cosponsors
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Internet crimes against children fund. Establishes the Internet crimes against children fund (fund). Requires the state police department (department) to administer the fund and use money in the fund to: (1) pay for costs incurred by the department for training and purchasing equipment for the investigation of offenses that involve the use of the Internet in which a child is the alleged victim; and (2) award grants to county, city, and town law enforcement agencies that agree to use the money to investigate Internet crimes against children in accordance with United States Department of Justice Internet Crimes Against Children Operational and Investigative Standards.
Title
Internet crimes against children fund. Establishes the Internet crimes against children fund (fund). Requires the state police department (department) to administer the fund and use money in the fund to: (1) pay for costs incurred by the department for training and purchasing equipment for the investigation of offenses that involve the use of the Internet in which a child is the alleged victim; and (2) award grants to county, city, and town law enforcement agencies that agree to use the money to investigate Internet crimes against children in accordance with United States Department of Justice Internet Crimes Against Children Operational and Investigative Standards.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-05 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-11 | House | Representatives Zent and Bartels added as cosponsors |
2019-03-05 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127 |
2019-03-05 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2019-02-26 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Veterans Affairs and Public Safety |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Senators Crane and Messmer added as coauthors |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Cosponsor: Representative Cherry |
2019-02-14 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Frye R |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 119: yeas 47, nays 0 |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Senator Houchin added as coauthor |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Senators Tallian, Brown L, Charbonneau, Holdman added as coauthors |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Senators Freeman, Bohacek, Glick, Randolph, Young M added as coauthors |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Senator Head added as second author |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Committee report: do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-01-07 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-01-07 | Senate | Authored by Senator Crider |