IN SB0002 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-4)
Status: Passed on April 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-01 - Public Law 3
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-4)
Status: Passed on April 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-01 - Public Law 3
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Funding for virtual instruction in public schools. Establishes a definition of "virtual instruction" for purposes of determining a school corporation's basic tuition support using the: (1) 2020 fall count; and (2) 2021 spring count; of average daily membership.
Title
Funding for virtual instruction in public schools.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 44 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 92 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 41 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-13 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 92 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 41 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-13 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-01 | Senate | Public Law 3 |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-03-23 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Senator Yoder added as coauthor |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 236: yeas 44, nays 4 |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Motion to concur filed |
2021-03-08 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2021-03-08 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 241: yeas 93, nays 2 |
2021-03-04 | House | Amendment #1 (Porter) motion withdrawn |
2021-03-04 | House | Amendment #2 (Pfaff) motion withdrawn |
2021-03-04 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2021-03-01 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2021-02-02 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2021-02-02 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Slager |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 35: yeas 41, nays 6 |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Senator Melton added as coauthor |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Senator Charbonneau added as coauthor |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Tallian) failed; voice vote |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Senator Ford Jon added as coauthor |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Senators Baldwin S, Bassler, Garten added as coauthors |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Senator Ford J.D. added as coauthor |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Senators Gaskill and Qaddoura added as coauthors |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Senator Rogers added as coauthor |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Senator Kruse added as third author |
2021-01-05 | Senate | Senator Buchanan added as second author |
2021-01-04 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development |
2021-01-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Raatz |