IN SB0001 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 30-1)
Status: Passed on February 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-18 - Public Law 1
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Civil immunity related to COVID-19. Provides civil tort immunity for damages arising from COVID-19 on the premises owned or operated by a person, on any premises on which the person or an employee or agent of the person provided property or services to the individual, or during an activity managed, organized, or sponsored by the person, except for an act or omission that constitutes gross negligence or willful or wanton misconduct (including fraud and intentionally tortious acts). Defines "COVID-19 protective product" and provides civil tort immunity for harm that results from the design, manufacture, labeling, sale, distribution, or donation of a COVID-19 protective product, except for an act or omission that constitutes gross negligence or willful or wanton misconduct (including fraud and intentionally tortious acts). Prohibits class action suits.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Civil immunity related to COVID-19.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 39 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 72 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - House - House - Amendment #4 (Nisly) failed (Y: 3 N: 90 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2021-02-09 - House - House - Amendment #1 (DeLaney) failed (Y: 29 N: 62 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2021-02-02 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 40 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #2 (Lanane) failed (Y: 11 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-01-13 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-18SenatePublic Law 1
2021-02-18SenateSigned by the Governor
2021-02-17SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2021-02-15HouseSigned by the Speaker
2021-02-15SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2021-02-15SenateSenate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 99: yeas 39, nays 7
2021-02-12SenateMotion to concur filed
2021-02-12HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2021-02-11HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 117: yeas 72, nays 21
2021-02-09HouseAmendment #4 (Nisly) failed; Roll Call 97: yeas 3, nays 90
2021-02-09HouseAmendment #1 (DeLaney) failed; Roll Call 96: yeas 29, nays 62
2021-02-09HouseAmendment #7 (Torr) prevailed; voice vote
2021-02-09HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2021-02-02HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2021-02-01HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
2021-01-28SenateReferred to the House
2021-01-28SenateSenator Raatz added as coauthor
2021-01-28SenateSenator Tomes added as coauthor
2021-01-28SenateSenator Niezgodski added as coauthor
2021-01-28SenateSenators Niemeyer, Grooms, Boots, Perfect added as coauthors
2021-01-28SenateCosponsors: Representatives Lehman, Jeter C, Young J
2021-01-28SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Torr
2021-01-28SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 25: yeas 40, nays 8
2021-01-26SenateSenators Doriot, Baldwin S, Crider, Holdman added as coauthors
2021-01-26SenateSenators Charbonneau, Alting, Gaskill, Garten, Buck, Bassler added as coauthors
2021-01-26SenateAmendment #2 (Lanane) failed; Roll Call 15: yeas 11, nays 38
2021-01-26SenateAmendment #3 (Messmer) prevailed; voice vote
2021-01-26SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2021-01-25SenateSenator Freeman added as coauthor
2021-01-14SenateSenator Kruse added as coauthor
2021-01-14SenateSenator Houchin added as coauthor
2021-01-14SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2021-01-11SenateSenator Becker added as coauthor
2021-01-05SenateSenators Buchanan and Rogers added as coauthors
2021-01-04SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
2021-01-04SenateCoauthored by Senator Zay
2021-01-04SenateAuthored by Senators Messmer, Koch, Brown L

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2021/bills/senate/1/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/9/e/f/89ef2b7a/SB0001.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/f/d/4/cfd4e54e/SB0001.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/6/2/e/e62e0c91/SB0001.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/2/4/0/d240e5c7/SB0001.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/7/c/b/87cb9989/SB0001.03.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/f/3/3/1f33a5dc/SB0001.03.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/0/9/8/50987c85/SB0001.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/0/8/b/008bab85/SB0001.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/f/1/5/0f15f7df/SB0001.05.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/a/9/e/ca9eac3e/SB0001.05.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/0/d/e/20de0afa/SB0001.06.ENRH.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/8/4/c/784c54a5/SB0001.02.COMS.AMS001.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/c/8/e/1c8e0b65/SB0001.02.COMS.AMS002.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/e/e/4/0ee443ea/SB0001.02.COMS.AMS003.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/1/d/5/c1d56739/SB0001.04.COMH.AMH001.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/c/b/d/bcbd92c6/SB0001.04.COMH.AMH002.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/0/3/6/0036cfe9/SB0001.04.COMH.AMH003.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/e/e/e/eeeeff92/SB0001.04.COMH.AMH004.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/5/3/f/253fa15e/SB0001.04.COMH.AMH005.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/e/e/6/dee6244d/SB0001.04.COMH.AMH006.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/3/b/3/d3b35a86/SB0001.04.COMH.AMH007.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/4/c/3/b4c39e10/SB0001.01.INTR.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/0/e/a/c0eafcff/SB0001.01.INTR.CRS001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/3/3/c/233c909d/SB0001.02.COMS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/9/2/2/09225a58/SB0001.03.ENGS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/2/6/1/0261695f/SB0001.03.ENGS.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/8/4/d/984d0419/SB0001.03.ENGS.CRH001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/c/a/a/bcaa5fbb/SB0001.04.COMH.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/c/6/f/7c6fa88e/SB0001.05.ENGH.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/e/d/c/0edc77ae/SB0001.05.ENGH.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/1/e/1/c1e1e622/SB0001.05.ENGH.CON01.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/a/b/d/4abd4f2f/SB0001.06.ENRH.FN001.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/0/1/c/e01c94f8/SB0001.01.INTR.04.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/2/4/a/a24a7416/SB0001.15_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/c/6/0/9c60bb8a/SB0001.25_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/9/6/4/e964af09/SB0001.03.ENGS.03.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/3/d/0/83d00433/SB0001.96_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/4/a/4/34a43b7e/SB0001.97_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/2/b/5/a2b5e160/SB0001.117_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/f/f/1/8ff13748/SB0001.99_S.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback