IN HR0020 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 32-7)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-05 - Representatives Abbott D, Austin, Aylesworth, Bauer, Beck, Burton, Carbaugh, Cherry, Clere, Cook, Davisson, DeVon, Ellington, Engleman, GiaQuinta, Goodrich, Heaton, Kirchhofer, Lauer, Lehe, Lindauer, Lucas, Miller, Moed, Morris, Prescott, Pressel, Schaibley, Shackleford, Sherman D, Steuerwald, VanNatter, Vermilion A, Zent, Ziemke added as coauthors
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Urging the pursuit of policy that increases organ donor supply.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urging the pursuit of policy that increases organ donor supply.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-04 - House - House - Second reading (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-05HouseRepresentatives Abbott D, Austin, Aylesworth, Bauer, Beck, Burton, Carbaugh, Cherry, Clere, Cook, Davisson, DeVon, Ellington, Engleman, GiaQuinta, Goodrich, Heaton, Kirchhofer, Lauer, Lehe, Lindauer, Lucas, Miller, Moed, Morris, Prescott, Pressel, Schaibley, Shackleford, Sherman D, Steuerwald, VanNatter, Vermilion A, Zent, Ziemke added as coauthors
2020-03-04HouseSecond reading: adopted Roll Call 310: yeas 86, nays 0
2020-02-27HouseRepresentatives Barrett, Fleming, Manning added as coauthors
2020-02-27HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2020-02-17HouseFirst reading: referred to the Committee on Public Health
2020-02-17HouseAuthored by Representative Bacon

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback