IN HR0020 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 32-7)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - Representatives Abbott D, Austin, Aylesworth, Bauer, Beck, Burton, Carbaugh, Cherry, Clere, Cook, Davisson, DeVon, Ellington, Engleman, GiaQuinta, Goodrich, Heaton, Kirchhofer, Lauer, Lehe, Lindauer, Lucas, Miller, Moed, Morris, Prescott, Pressel, Schaibley, Shackleford, Sherman D, Steuerwald, VanNatter, Vermilion A, Zent, Ziemke added as coauthors
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - Representatives Abbott D, Austin, Aylesworth, Bauer, Beck, Burton, Carbaugh, Cherry, Clere, Cook, Davisson, DeVon, Ellington, Engleman, GiaQuinta, Goodrich, Heaton, Kirchhofer, Lauer, Lehe, Lindauer, Lucas, Miller, Moed, Morris, Prescott, Pressel, Schaibley, Shackleford, Sherman D, Steuerwald, VanNatter, Vermilion A, Zent, Ziemke added as coauthors
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Urging the pursuit of policy that increases organ donor supply.
Title
Urging the pursuit of policy that increases organ donor supply.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - House - House - Second reading (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-05 | House | Representatives Abbott D, Austin, Aylesworth, Bauer, Beck, Burton, Carbaugh, Cherry, Clere, Cook, Davisson, DeVon, Ellington, Engleman, GiaQuinta, Goodrich, Heaton, Kirchhofer, Lauer, Lehe, Lindauer, Lucas, Miller, Moed, Morris, Prescott, Pressel, Schaibley, Shackleford, Sherman D, Steuerwald, VanNatter, Vermilion A, Zent, Ziemke added as coauthors |
2020-03-04 | House | Second reading: adopted Roll Call 310: yeas 86, nays 0 |
2020-02-27 | House | Representatives Barrett, Fleming, Manning added as coauthors |
2020-02-27 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2020-02-17 | House | First reading: referred to the Committee on Public Health |
2020-02-17 | House | Authored by Representative Bacon |