IN HR0018 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 40-8)
Status: Passed on March 13 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-27 - Representative DeLaney added as coauthor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 40-8)
Status: Passed on March 13 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-27 - Representative DeLaney added as coauthor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Celebrating the 25th Anniversary of the Good Friday Agreement and St. Patrick's Day. Celebrating the 25th Anniversary of the Good Friday Agreement and St. Patrick's Day.
Title
Celebrating the 25th Anniversary of the Good Friday Agreement and St. Patrick's Day.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-27 | House | Representative DeLaney added as coauthor |
2023-03-23 | House | Representatives Miller K, McNamara, Speedy, Payne Z, Abbott D, Zent, Lauer, Errington, Patterson L, Dvorak, May, Baird, Haggard C, Teshka J, Miller D, Heine, Snow C, Goodrich, Judy, McGuire J, Morris, Pierce M, Cherry, Thompson, Garcia Wilburn V, King J, Pressel, Lucas, Sweet L, Culp K, Engleman, Criswell C, Rowray E, Soliday, Frye, Aylesworth, Hamilton, Hall D, Davis M, Clere added as coauthors |
2023-03-21 | House | Representatives Bartels and Genda M added as coauthors |
2023-03-20 | House | Representative Wesco added as coauthor |
2023-03-20 | House | Representative Harris added as coauthor |
2023-03-13 | House | First reading: adopted voice vote |
2023-03-13 | House | Coauthored by Representatives Barrett and Lehman |
2023-03-13 | House | Authored by Representative O'Brien |
Subjects
Indiana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://iga.in.gov/legislative/2023/resolutions/house/simple/18 |
Text | https://iga.in.gov/legislative/2023/resolutions/house/simple/18#1.INTR |