IN HR0002 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-25 - Second reading: adopted Roll Call 52: yeas 94, nays 0
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-25 - Second reading: adopted Roll Call 52: yeas 94, nays 0
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Urging the legislative council to assign the topic of medical marijuana to the interim study committee on public health, behavioral health, and human services during the 2018 interim.
Title
Urging the legislative council to assign the topic of medical marijuana to the interim study committee on public health, behavioral health, and human services during the 2018 interim.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-25 - House - House - Second reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-25 | House | Second reading: adopted Roll Call 52: yeas 94, nays 0 |
2018-01-18 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2018-01-08 | House | First reading: referred to the Committee on Public Health |
2018-01-08 | House | Coauthored by Representatives Kirchhofer, Judy and Summers |
2018-01-08 | House | Authored by Representative Lehman |