IN HJR0001 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-26 - Public Law 253
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-26 - Public Law 253
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Gubernatorial line of succession. Removes the superintendent of public instruction from the list of officeholders who shall discharge the powers and duties of the governor if the office of the governor and lieutenant governor are both vacant. This proposed amendment has been agreed to by one general assembly.
Title
Gubernatorial line of succession.
Sponsors
Rep. John Prescott [R] | Rep. Ryan Lauer [R] | Sen. Jeff Raatz [R] | Sen. James Buck [R] |
Sen. Linda Rogers [R] | Sen. Susan Glick [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-16 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-26 | House | Public Law 253 |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2023-03-22 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Returned to the House without amendments |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 222: yeas 47, nays 0 |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2023-02-23 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2023-02-01 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2023-01-31 | House | Cosponsor: Senator Glick |
2023-01-31 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Raatz, Buck, Rogers |
2023-01-31 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 62: yeas 99, nays 0 |
2023-01-30 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2023-01-26 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2023-01-09 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2023-01-09 | House | Authored by Representative Prescott |
2023-01-09 | House | Coauthored by Representative Lauer |