IN HJR0001 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-25 - Public Law 116
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-25 - Public Law 116
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires, for property taxes first due and payable in 2012 and thereafter, the general assembly to limit a taxpayer's property tax liability as follows: (1) A taxpayer's property tax liability on homestead property may not exceed 1% of the gross assessed value of the homestead property. (2) A taxpayer's property tax liability on other residential property may not exceed 2% of the gross assessed value of the other residential property. (3) A taxpayer's property tax liability on agricultural land may not exceed 2% of the gross assessed value of the property that is the basis for the determination of the agricultural land. (4) A taxpayer's property tax liability on other real property may not exceed 3% of the gross assessed value of the other real property. (5) A taxpayer's property tax liability on personal property may not exceed 3% of the gross assessed value of the taxpayer's personal property that is the basis for the determination of property taxes within a particular taxing district. Specifies that property taxes imposed after being approved by the voters in a referendum shall not be considered for purposes of calculating the limits to property tax liability under these provisions. Provides that in the case of a county for which the general assembly determines in 2008 that limits to property tax liability are expected to reduce in 2010 the aggregate property tax revenue that would otherwise be collected by all units and school corporations in the county by at least 20%, the general assembly may provide that property taxes imposed in the county to pay debt service or make lease payments for bonds or leases issued or entered into before July 1, 2008, shall not be considered for purposes of calculating the limits to property tax.
Title
Circuit breakers and other property tax matters.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-25 | Public Law 116 | |
2010-03-08 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2010-03-03 | Signed by the President Pro Tempore | |
2010-03-02 | Signed by the Speaker | |
2010-01-19 | Senator Mrvan added as cosponsor | |
2010-01-19 | Returned to the House without amendments | |
2010-01-19 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 13: Yeas 35 and Nays 15 | |
2010-01-14 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2010-01-13 | Representatives Reske, Herrell and Turner added as coauthors | |
2010-01-12 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | |
2010-01-11 | First reading: referred to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy | |
2010-01-11 | Senate sponsors: Senators Kenley, Miller and Hershman | |
2010-01-11 | Referred to the Senate | |
2010-01-11 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 10: Yeas 75, Nays 23 | |
2010-01-07 | Amendment 2 (Michael), withdrawn | |
2010-01-07 | Amendment 3 (Fry), failed; Roll Call 6: Yeas 15, Nays 83 | |
2010-01-07 | Amendment 1 (Crawford), failed; Roll Call 5: Yeas 30, Nays 69 | |
2010-01-07 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2010-01-05 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | |
2009-11-17 | First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means | |
2009-11-17 | Authored by Representative Crawford |
Indiana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.in.gov/apps/lsa/session/billwatch/billinfo?year=2010&session=1&request=getBill&doctype=HJR&docno=0001 |
Text | http://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2010/RES/HJ0001.4.html |