IN HCR0040 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 66-33)
Status: Passed on February 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-05 - Representatives Austin, Aylesworth, Bacon, Bartels, Bartlett, Bauer, Beck, Behning, Borders, Bosma, Boy, Brown, T., Campbell, Candelaria Reardon, Carbaugh, Chyung, DeLaney, Deal, Dvorak, Errington, Fleming, Forestal, Frye, GiaQuinta, Goodin, Gutwein, Hamilton, Harris, Hatcher, Hatfield, Hostettler, Huston, Jackson, Jordan, Judy, Karickhoff, Kirchhofer, Klinker, Lauer, Lehe, Lehman, Leonard, Lindauer, Lucas, Manning, May, Mayfield, Moed, Morris, Morrison, Moseley, Nisly, Pfaff, Pierce, Porter, Pryor, Saunders, Shackleford, Smaltz, Smith, V., Soliday, Stutzman, Sullivan, Summers, VanNatter, Wesco, Wolkins, Wright, Young J, Ziemke added as coauthors
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION recognizing dyslexia in Hoosier youth.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION recognizing dyslexia in Hoosier youth.

Sponsors

Rep. Charles Burton [R]Rep. David Abbott [R]Rep. Beau Baird [R]Rep. Bradford Barrett [R]
Rep. Robert Cherry [R]Rep. Edward Clere [R]Rep. Anthony Cook [R]Rep. Steven Davisson [R]
Rep. Dale DeVon [R]Rep. Sean Eberhart [R]Rep. Jeff Ellington [R]Rep. Karen Engleman [R]
Rep. Chuck Goodrich [R]Rep. Robert Heaton [R]Rep. Randy Lyness [R]Rep. Karlee Macer [D]
Rep. Wendy McNamara [R]Rep. Doug Miller [R]Rep. Sharon Negele [R]Rep. John Prescott [R]
Rep. Jim Pressel [R]Rep. Donna Schaibley [R]Rep. Dollyne Sherman [R]Rep. Gregory Steuerwald [R]
Rep. Jeffrey Thompson [R]Rep. Gerald Torr [R]Rep. Ann Vermilion [R]Rep. Dennis Zent [R]
Rep. Terri Jo Austin [D]Rep. Micheal Aylesworth [R]Rep. Ronald Bacon [R]Rep. Steve Bartels [R]
Rep. John Bartlett [D]Rep. Patrick Bauer [D]Rep. Lisa Beck [D]Rep. Robert Behning [R]
Rep. Bruce Borders [R]Rep. Brian Bosma [R]Rep. Pat Boy [D]Rep. Timothy Brown [R]
Rep. Chris Campbell [D]Rep. Mara Reardon [D]Rep. Martin Carbaugh [R]Rep. Chris Chyung [D]
Rep. Edward DeLaney [D]Rep. Ross Deal [D]Rep. Ryan Dvorak [D]Rep. Sue Errington [D]
Rep. Rita Fleming [D]Rep. Dan Forestal [D]Rep. Randall Frye [R]Rep. Philip GiaQuinta [D]
Rep. Terry Goodin [D]Rep. Doug Gutwein [R]Rep. Carey Hamilton [D]Rep. Earl Harris [D]
Rep. Ragen Hatcher [D]Rep. Ryan Hatfield [D]Rep. Matt Hostettler [R]Rep. Todd Huston [R]
Rep. Carolyn Jackson [D]Rep. Jack Jordan [R]Rep. Christopher Judy [R]Rep. Michael Karickhoff [R]
Rep. Cindy Kirchhofer [R]Rep. Sheila Klinker [D]Rep. Ryan Lauer [R]Rep. Donald Lehe [R]
Rep. Matthew Lehman [R]Rep. Daniel Leonard [R]Rep. Shane Lindauer [R]Rep. Jim Lucas [R]
Rep. Ethan Manning [R]Rep. Chris May [R]Rep. Peggy Mayfield [R]Rep. Justin Moed [D]
Rep. Robert Morris [R]Rep. Alan Morrison [R]Rep. Charles Moseley [D]Rep. Curt Nisly [R]
Rep. Tonya Pfaff [D]Rep. Matt Pierce [D]Rep. Gregory Porter [D]Rep. Cherrish Pryor [D]
Rep. Thomas Saunders [R]Rep. Robin Shackleford [D]Rep. Ben Smaltz [R]Rep. Vernon Smith [D]
Rep. Edmond Soliday [R]Rep. Christy Stutzman [R]Rep. Holli Sullivan [R]Rep. Vanessa Summers [D]
Rep. Heath VanNatter [R]Rep. Timothy Wesco [R]Rep. David Wolkins [R]Rep. Melanie Wright [D]
Rep. John Young [R]Rep. Cindy Ziemke [R]Sen. Erin Houchin [R]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-05HouseRepresentatives Austin, Aylesworth, Bacon, Bartels, Bartlett, Bauer, Beck, Behning, Borders, Bosma, Boy, Brown, T., Campbell, Candelaria Reardon, Carbaugh, Chyung, DeLaney, Deal, Dvorak, Errington, Fleming, Forestal, Frye, GiaQuinta, Goodin, Gutwein, Hamilton, Harris, Hatcher, Hatfield, Hostettler, Huston, Jackson, Jordan, Judy, Karickhoff, Kirchhofer, Klinker, Lauer, Lehe, Lehman, Leonard, Lindauer, Lucas, Manning, May, Mayfield, Moed, Morris, Morrison, Moseley, Nisly, Pfaff, Pierce, Porter, Pryor, Saunders, Shackleford, Smaltz, Smith, V., Soliday, Stutzman, Sullivan, Summers, VanNatter, Wesco, Wolkins, Wright, Young J, Ziemke added as coauthors
2020-03-03HouseRepresentatives Abbott D, Baird, Barrett, Cherry, Clere, Cook, Davisson, DeVon, Eberhart, Ellington, Engleman, Goodrich, Heaton, Lyness, Macer, McNamara, Miller, Negele, Prescott, Pressel, Schaibley, Sherman D, Steuerwald, Thompson, Torr, Vermilion A, Zent added as coauthors
2020-02-25SenateReturned to the House
2020-02-24SenateFirst reading: adopted voice vote
2020-02-24HouseReferred to the Senate
2020-02-24HouseSenate sponsor: Senator Houchin
2020-02-24HouseFirst reading: adopted voice vote
2020-02-24HouseAuthored by Representative Burton

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback