IN HCR0037 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-2)
Status: Passed on March 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-31 - Returned to the House
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION honoring Dr. Virginia Caine.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION honoring Dr. Virginia Caine.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-31SenateReturned to the House
2021-03-30SenateSenator Sandlin removed as cosponsor
2021-03-30SenateFirst reading: adopted voice vote
2021-03-26HouseReferred to the Senate
2021-03-25HouseCosponsors: Senators Ford J.D., Walker K, Crider, Sandlin
2021-03-25HouseSenate sponsors: Senators Taylor G, Qaddoura, Breaux
2021-03-25HouseFirst reading: adopted voice vote
2021-03-25HouseCoauthored by Representatives Johnson, Porter, Gore, Moed, Pack, Hamilton, DeLaney, Shackleford, Summers, Pryor
2021-03-25HouseAuthored by Representative Bartlett

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback