IN HCR0037 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 28-18)
Status: Passed on February 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-25 - Returned to the House
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 28-18)
Status: Passed on February 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-25 - Returned to the House
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION urging Congress to display the portrait of Lucretia Mott, Elizabeth Cady Stanton, and Susan B. Anthony on U.S. currency recognizing women's fight for suffrage and honoring the 100th anniversary.
Title
A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION urging Congress to display the portrait of Lucretia Mott, Elizabeth Cady Stanton, and Susan B. Anthony on U.S. currency recognizing women's fight for suffrage and honoring the 100th anniversary.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-25 | Senate | Returned to the House |
2020-02-24 | Senate | First reading: adopted voice vote |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2020-02-17 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Rogers |
2020-02-17 | House | First reading: adopted voice vote |
2020-02-17 | House | Coauthored by Representatives Klinker, Jackson, Porter, Smith V, Deal, Campbell, DeLaney, Nisly, Zent, Ziemke, Thompson, Torr, Goodrich, Mayfield, Davisson, Schaibley, Beck, Hatfield, Chyung, GiaQuinta, DeVon, Soliday, Leonard, Frye R, Barrett, Miller D, Errington, Abbott, May, Baird, Fleming, Eberhart, Austin, Bartlett, Bauer, Cherry, Moseley, McNamara, Boy, Heine, Negele, Lehman, Carbaugh, Lindauer |
2020-02-17 | House | Authored by Representative Stutzman |
Indiana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://iga.in.gov/legislative/2020/resolutions/house/concurrent/37/details |
Text | http://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/a/6/b/ba6b973c/HC0037.01.INTR.pdf |