IN HCR0031 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-01 - Returned to the House
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-01 - Returned to the House
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Honoring the Angola High School marching band. A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION honoring the Angola High School marching band.
Title
Honoring the Angola High School marching band.
Sponsors
Rep. Dennis Zent [R] | Rep. Ben Smaltz [R] | Sen. Susan Glick [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-01 | Senate | Returned to the House |
2024-02-29 | Senate | First reading: adopted voice vote |
2024-02-27 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2024-02-26 | House | First reading: adopted |
2024-02-26 | House | Coauthored by Representative Smaltz |
2024-02-26 | House | Authored by Representative Zent |
2024-02-26 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Glick |
Indiana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://iga.in.gov/legislative/2024/resolutions/house/concurrent/31/details |
Text | https://iga.in.gov/pdf-documents/123/2024/house/resolutions/HC0031/HC0031.01.INTR.pdf |