IN HCR0031 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 37-14)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-13 - Senator Zakas added as cosponsor.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-13 - Senator Zakas added as cosponsor.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION supporting Taiwan's efforts to secure entry to the Trans-Pacific Partnership (TPP) and the signing of a Free Trade Agreement (FTA) and Bilateral Investment Agreement (BIA) with the United States and reaffirming support for increasing Taiwan's international profile and for strengthening and expanding sister-state ties between Indiana and Taiwan.
Title
A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION supporting Taiwan's efforts to secure entry to the Trans-Pacific Partnership (TPP) and the signing of a Free Trade Agreement (FTA) and Bilateral Investment Agreement (BIA) with the United States and reaffirming support for increasing Taiwan's international profile and for strengthening and expanding sister-state ties between Indiana and Taiwan.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-25 - House - House - First reading: adopted (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senator Zakas added as cosponsor. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senator R. Young added as cosponsor. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senator M. Young added as cosponsor. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senator Yoder added as cosponsor. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senator Wyss added as cosponsor. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senator Waterman added as cosponsor. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senator Walker added as cosponsor. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senator Tomes added as cosponsor. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senator Taylor added as cosponsor. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senator Tallian added as cosponsor. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senator Stoops added as cosponsor. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senator Steele added as cosponsor. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senator Smith added as cosponsor. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senator Skinner added as cosponsor. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senator Schneider added as cosponsor. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senator Rogers added as cosponsor. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senator Paul added as cosponsor. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senator Nugent added as cosponsor. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senator Mrvan added as cosponsor. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senator Mishler added as cosponsor. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senator Pat Miller added as cosponsor. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senator Pete Miller added as cosponsor. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senator Merritt added as cosponsor. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senator Long added as cosponsor. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senator Leising added as cosponsor. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senator Landske added as cosponsor. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senator Lanane added as cosponsor. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senator Kruse added as cosponsor. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senator Hume added as cosponsor. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senator Holdman added as cosponsor. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senator Hershman added as cosponsor. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senator Head added as cosponsor. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senator Grooms added as cosponsor. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senator Glick added as cosponsor. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senator Eckerty added as cosponsor. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senator Delph added as cosponsor. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senator Crider added as cosponsor. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senator Charbonneau added as cosponsor. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senator Buck added as cosponsor. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senator Broden added as cosponsor. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senator Breaux added as cosponsor. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senator Bray added as cosponsor. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senator Boots added as cosponsor. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senator Becker added as cosponsor. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senator Banks added as cosponsor. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senator Arnold added as cosponsor. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senator Alting added as cosponsor. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Second reading: adopted voice vote |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to Commerce, Economic Development & Technology |
2014-02-26 | House | Senator Waltz added as sponsor. |
2014-02-25 | House | First reading: adopted Roll Call 290: yeas 90 and nays 0 |
2014-02-25 | House | Representative Harris added as coauthor. |
2014-02-20 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted. |
2014-02-13 | House | Assigned to Statutory Committee on Interstate and International Cooperation |
2014-02-11 | House | Authored by Representative Frizzell. |