IN HCR0030 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-01 - Returned to the House
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-01 - Returned to the House
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizing Monroe Gray, Jr. A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION recognizing Monroe Gray, Jr.
Title
Recognizing Monroe Gray, Jr.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-01 | Senate | Returned to the House |
2024-02-29 | Senate | First reading: adopted voice vote |
2024-02-27 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2024-02-26 | House | First reading: adopted |
2024-02-26 | House | Coauthored by Representatives Harris, Jackson, Pack, Bartlett, Hatcher, Porter, Shackleford, Smith V, Summers |
2024-02-26 | House | Authored by Representative Pryor |
2024-02-26 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Taylor G |
Indiana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://iga.in.gov/legislative/2024/resolutions/house/concurrent/30/details |
Text | https://iga.in.gov/pdf-documents/123/2024/house/resolutions/HC0030/HC0030.01.INTR.pdf |