IN HCR0025 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-23 - Returned to the House
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION recognizing 86 volunteer firefighters with 50 years of service to fire departments across Indiana.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION recognizing 86 volunteer firefighters with 50 years of service to fire departments across Indiana.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-02-23SenateReturned to the House
2022-02-22SenateFirst reading: adopted voice vote
2022-02-18HouseReferred to the Senate
2022-02-17HouseSenate sponsor: Senator Crider
2022-02-17HouseFirst reading: adopted voice vote
2022-02-17HouseAuthored by Representative Frye R

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback