IN HCR0024 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-17 - Second reading: adopted voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION recognizing the problem of malnutrition and its effect on health outcomes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION recognizing the problem of malnutrition and its effect on health outcomes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-02-12 - Senate - Senate Committee on Health and Provider Services - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - House - House Floor - (Y: 73 N: 22 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - House - House Committee on Roads and Transportation - Roll Call 104201 (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-02-17SenateSecond reading: adopted voice vote
2014-02-13HouseRepresentative Davisson added as coauthor.
2014-02-13HouseRepresentative C. Brown added as coauthor.
2014-02-13SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted.
2014-02-04SenateFirst Reading: Referred to Health and Provider Services
2014-02-03HouseSenator Lanane added as third sponsor.
2014-02-03HouseSenator Landske added as second sponsor.
2014-02-03HouseSenator Miller, Pat added as sponsor.
2014-02-03HouseFirst reading: adopted voice vote
2014-02-03HouseCoauthored by Representative Porter.
2014-02-03HouseCoauthored by Representative Lehe.
2014-02-03HouseAuthored by Senator Clere.

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback