IN HCR0018 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on March 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-09 - Returned to the House
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on March 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-09 - Returned to the House
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION urging the Indiana Department of Transportation to rename that segment of U.S. Highway 421 from the Jefferson/Ripley County line to the junction of U.S. Highway 421 and State Road 62 the "Major Samuel Woodfill Memorial Highway".
Title
A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION urging the Indiana Department of Transportation to rename that segment of U.S. Highway 421 from the Jefferson/Ripley County line to the junction of U.S. Highway 421 and State Road 62 the "Major Samuel Woodfill Memorial Highway".
Sponsors
Rep. Randall Frye [R] | Rep. Terry Goodin [D] | Rep. Jim Lucas [R] | Rep. James Baird [R] |
Rep. Doug Gutwein [R] | Rep. Christopher Judy [R] | Sen. James Merritt [R] | Sen. Clyde Perfect [R] |
Sen. James Smith [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - House - House - Second reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - House - House - Second reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-09 | Senate | Returned to the House |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Second reading: adopted voice vote |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2018-02-20 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security and Transportation |
2018-02-20 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2018-02-19 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Merritt, Perfect and Smith J |
2018-02-19 | House | Second reading: adopted Roll Call 185: yeas 91, nays 0 |
2018-02-15 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2018-01-18 | House | First reading: referred to the Committee on Roads and Transportation |
2018-01-18 | House | Coauthored by Representatives Goodin, Lucas, Baird, Gutwein and Judy |
2018-01-18 | House | Authored by Representative Frye R |