IN HCR0017 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 18 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-20 - First reading: adopted voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION congratulating the Indiana University School of Nursing on the occasion of the 100th anniversary of its founding.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION congratulating the Indiana University School of Nursing on the occasion of the 100th anniversary of its founding.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-02-20SenateFirst reading: adopted voice vote
2014-02-18HouseSenator Breaux added as cosponsor.
2014-02-18HouseSenator Waltz added as third sponsor.
2014-02-18HouseSenator Pat Miller added as sponsor.
2014-02-18HouseSenator Delph added as second sponsor.
2014-02-18HouseFirst reading: adopted voice vote
2014-02-13HouseRepresentative Moed added as coauthor.
2014-02-13HouseRepresentative Bauer added as coauthor.
2014-02-13HouseRepresentative C. Brown added as coauthor.
2014-02-13HouseRepresentative Davisson added as coauthor.
2014-02-11HouseAuthored by Representative Clere.

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback