IN HCR0014 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-02 - Returned to the House
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-02 - Returned to the House
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION urging the commissioner of the Indiana Department of Transportation to rename the section of U.S. Highway 50 and Jennings County Road 150 N. on the west side of North Vernon to just off the old U.S. Highway 50 on the east side as it approaches the Muscatatuck River as the "Officer Anthony Burton and Reserve Officer Lonnie Howard Memorial Highway".
Title
A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION urging the commissioner of the Indiana Department of Transportation to rename the section of U.S. Highway 50 and Jennings County Road 150 N. on the west side of North Vernon to just off the old U.S. Highway 50 on the east side as it approaches the Muscatatuck River as the "Officer Anthony Burton and Reserve Officer Lonnie Howard Memorial Highway".
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - House - House - Second reading (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - House - House - Second reading (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-02 | Senate | Returned to the House |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Second reading: adopted voice vote |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2018-02-20 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security and Transportation |
2018-02-20 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2018-02-19 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Perfect |
2018-02-19 | House | Second reading: adopted Roll Call 184: yeas 90, nays 0 |
2018-02-15 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2018-01-18 | House | First reading: referred to the Committee on Roads and Transportation |
2018-01-18 | House | Coauthored by Representatives Frye R and Goodin |
2018-01-18 | House | Authored by Representative Lucas |