IN HCR0012 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-17 - Returned to the House
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-17 - Returned to the House
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION congratulating Lowell High School junior Karina James for winning the IHSAA Cross Country Championship.
Title
A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION congratulating Lowell High School junior Karina James for winning the IHSAA Cross Country Championship.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-17 | Senate | Returned to the House |
2021-02-16 | Senate | First reading: adopted voice vote |
2021-02-12 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2021-02-11 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Niemeyer |
2021-02-11 | House | First reading: adopted voice vote |
2021-02-11 | House | Authored by Representative Aylesworth |
Indiana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://iga.in.gov/legislative/2021/resolutions/house/concurrent/12/details |
Text | http://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/0/5/6/30564eb9/HC0012.01.INTR.pdf |