IN HCR0012 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 14 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-14 - Senators Waterman, Steele and Banks added as cosponsors
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 14 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-14 - Senators Waterman, Steele and Banks added as cosponsors
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Exhibiting State of Indiana's support for the nation of Israel.
Title
Exhibiting State of Indiana's support for the nation of Israel.
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Bosma [R] | Rep. Edward DeLaney [D] | Rep. Sheila Klinker [D] | Rep. Mara Reardon [D] |
Rep. Eric Turner [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-02-14 - House - House - Second reading: adopted Roll Call 154: yeas 91, nays 0 (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-14 | Senators Waterman, Steele and Banks added as cosponsors | |
2011-03-14 | Senator Schneider added as cosponsor | |
2011-03-14 | Returned to the House | |
2011-03-14 | Second reading: adopted voice vote | |
2011-03-10 | Senator Hume added as cosponsor | |
2011-03-08 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | |
2011-02-15 | First reading: referred to Committee on Appointments and Claims | |
2011-02-14 | Senate sponsors: Senators Delph and Long | |
2011-02-14 | Referred to the Senate | |
2011-02-14 | Second reading: adopted Roll Call 154: yeas 91, nays 0 | |
2011-02-14 | Representatives Klinker and Candelaria Reardon added as coauthors | |
2011-02-14 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | |
2011-02-10 | Representative Turner added as coauthor | |
2011-01-12 | Referred to Committee on Statutory Committee on Interstate and International Cooperation | |
2011-01-12 | Coauthored by Representative DeLaney | |
2011-01-12 | Authored by Representative Bosma |