IN HCR0011 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 107-43)
Status: Passed on February 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-13 - Second reading: adopted standing vote
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 107-43)
Status: Passed on February 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-13 - Second reading: adopted standing vote
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION urging the creation of a Medal of Honor Memorial Highway in Indiana.
Title
A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION urging the creation of a Medal of Honor Memorial Highway in Indiana.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House - Second reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House - Second reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-13 | Senate | Second reading: adopted standing vote |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Returned to the House |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Senators Alting, Bassler, Becker, Bohacek, Boots, Bray, Breaux, Brown L, Buchanan, Buck, Busch, Charbonneau, Crane, Crider, Donato, Doriot, Ford J.D., Ford Jon, Freeman, Gaskill, Grooms, Holdman, Houchin, Koch, Kruse, Lanane, Leising, Melton, Merritt, Messmer, Mishler, Niemeyer, Perfect, Raatz, Randolph, Rogers, Ruckelshaus, Sandlin, Spartz, Stoops, Tallian, Taylor G, Walker, Young M, Zay added as cosponsors |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Senator Mrvan added as cosponsor |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Senator Garten added as cosponsor |
2020-02-10 | House | Representatives Abbott D, Austin, Aylesworth, Bacon, Baird, Barrett, Bartels, Bartlett, Bauer, Beck, Behning, Borders, Bosma, Boy, Brown, T., Burton, Campbell, Candelaria Reardon, Carbaugh, Cherry, Chyung, Clere, Cook, Davisson, DeLaney, DeVon, Deal, Dvorak, Eberhart, Ellington, Engleman, Errington, Fleming, Forestal, Frye, GiaQuinta, Goodin, Goodrich, Gutwein, Hamilton, Harris, Hatcher, Hatfield, Heaton, Heine, Hostettler, Huston, Jackson, Jordan, Judy, Karickhoff, Kirchhofer, Klinker, Lauer, Lehe, Lehman, Leonard, Lindauer, Lucas, Lyness, Macer, Manning, May, Mayfield, McNamara, Miller, Moed, Morris, Morrison, Moseley, Negele, Nisly, Pfaff, Pierce, Porter, Prescott, Pressel, Pryor, Saunders, Schaibley, Shackleford, Sherman D, Smaltz, Smith, V., Soliday, Speedy, Steuerwald, Stutzman, Sullivan, Summers, Thompson, Torr, VanNatter, Vermilion A, Wesco, Wolkins, Wright, Young J, Ziemke added as coauthors |
2020-01-30 | House | Representative Lauer removed as coauthor |
2020-01-28 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security and Transportation |
2020-01-28 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2020-01-28 | House | Representative Lauer added as coauthor |
2020-01-27 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Glick, Tomes, Niezgodski |
2020-01-27 | House | Second reading: adopted Roll Call 58: yeas 93, nays 0 |
2020-01-23 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2020-01-21 | House | First reading: referred to the Committee on Roads and Transportation |
2020-01-21 | House | Authored by Representative Zent |