IN HCR0010 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-13 - First reading: referred to Committee on Veterans Affairs and The Military
Pending: Senate Veterans Affairs & The Military Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-13 - First reading: referred to Committee on Veterans Affairs and The Military
Pending: Senate Veterans Affairs & The Military Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION adding Indiana Veteran's Administration Medical Centers to the Center for Compassionate Innovation.
Title
A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION adding Indiana Veteran's Administration Medical Centers to the Center for Compassionate Innovation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-07 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-13 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Veterans Affairs and The Military |
2021-04-13 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2021-04-12 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Tomes |
2021-04-12 | House | Second reading: adopted voice vote |
2021-04-08 | House | Representative Barrett added as coauthor |
2021-04-08 | House | Representative Bartels added as coauthor |
2021-04-08 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2021-02-02 | House | First reading: referred to the Committee on Public Health |
2021-02-02 | House | Authored by Representative Zent |