IN HCR0008 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-11 - Returned to the House
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-11 - Returned to the House
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging the use of Indiana limestone.
Title
Urging the use of Indiana limestone.
Sponsors
Sen. Eric Koch [R] | Rep. Matt Pierce [D] | Rep. Peggy Welch [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-11 | Returned to the House | |
2010-03-11 | Second reading: adopted Voice Vote | |
2010-03-11 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | |
2010-03-11 | First reading: referred to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedure | |
2010-03-10 | Senate sponsor: Senator Steele | |
2010-03-10 | Referred to the Senate | |
2010-03-10 | Second reading: adopted Voice Vote | |
2010-02-22 | Representatives Pierce and Welch added as coauthors | |
2010-01-11 | Referred to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedures | |
2010-01-11 | Authored by Representative Koch |
Indiana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.in.gov/apps/lsa/session/billwatch/billinfo?year=2010&session=1&request=getBill&doctype=HCR&docno=0008 |
Text | http://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2010/HRESF/HC0008.html |