IN HCR0007 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 43-9)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-13 - Senators Alting, Bassler, Becker, Bohacek, Boots, Bray, Breaux, Brown L, Buck, Charbonneau, Crane, Crider, Delph, Doriot, Eckerty, Ford, Freeman, Glick, Grooms, Head, Hershman, Holdman, Houchin, Kenley, Koch, Kruse, Lanane, Leising, Long, Melton, Merritt, Messmer, Mishler, Mrvan, Niemeyer, Niezgodski, Perfect, Randolph, Ruckelshaus, Sandlin, Smith J, Stoops, Tallian, Taylor G, Tomes, Walker, Young M, Zakas, Zay added as cosponsors
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Urging the Indiana Department of Transportation to rename that section of U.S. Highway 27, both north and south, through Lynn, Indiana, as the "Captain Charles Edwin Engle Memorial Mile."

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urging the Indiana Department of Transportation to rename that section of U.S. Highway 27, both north and south, through Lynn, Indiana, as the "Captain Charles Edwin Engle Memorial Mile."

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-11 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - House - House - Second reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-13SenateSenators Alting, Bassler, Becker, Bohacek, Boots, Bray, Breaux, Brown L, Buck, Charbonneau, Crane, Crider, Delph, Doriot, Eckerty, Ford, Freeman, Glick, Grooms, Head, Hershman, Holdman, Houchin, Kenley, Koch, Kruse, Lanane, Leising, Long, Melton, Merritt, Messmer, Mishler, Mrvan, Niemeyer, Niezgodski, Perfect, Randolph, Ruckelshaus, Sandlin, Smith J, Stoops, Tallian, Taylor G, Tomes, Walker, Young M, Zakas, Zay added as cosponsors
2017-04-13SenateSecond reading: adopted voice vote
2017-04-11SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2017-04-04SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security and Transportation
2017-04-04HouseReferred to the Senate
2017-04-03HouseRepresentative Frye added as coauthor
2017-04-03HouseSenate sponsor: Senator Raatz
2017-04-03HouseSecond reading: adopted Roll Call 361: yeas 93, nays 0
2017-03-30HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2017-01-18HouseFirst reading: referred to the Committee on Roads and Transportation
2017-01-18HouseAuthored by Representative Beumer

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2017/resolutions/house/concurrent/7
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/8/3/9/c839f187/HC0007.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/6/b/f/26bfc419/HC0007.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/e/a/4/1ea4ada7/HC0007.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/5/1/8/351891c8/HC0007.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/b/b/b/7bbba0d2/HC0007.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/7/6/d/076d4977/HC0007.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/8/1/a/381a3650/HC0007.04.COMS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/f/d/d/9fdd43f4/HC0007.01.INTR.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/5/c/9/25c971bd/HC0007.361.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/e/2/3/fe2394c2/HC0007.03.COMH.00.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback