IN HCR0006 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-03 - Returned to the House
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION honoring the life of Mr. Byron David Ratcliffe Sr.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION honoring the life of Mr. Byron David Ratcliffe Sr.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-03SenateReturned to the House
2021-02-02SenateFirst reading: adopted standing vote
2021-01-29HouseReferred to the Senate
2021-01-28HouseSenate sponsor: Senator Taylor G
2021-01-28HouseFirst reading: adopted voice vote
2021-01-28HouseAuthored by Representative Pryor

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback