IN HB1668 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Public Law 181
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Public Law 181
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Use of Social Security numbers in credit files. Requires a consumer reporting agency that uses a Social Security number as a factor in determining whether a file matches the identity of the subject of a credit inquiry to ensure that the name and at least one additional identifier of the subject matches the name and the same identifier in the file.
Title
Use of Social Security numbers in credit files. Requires a consumer reporting agency that uses a Social Security number as a factor in determining whether a file matches the identity of the subject of a credit inquiry to ensure that the name and at least one additional identifier of the subject matches the name and the same identifier in the file.
Sponsors
Rep. Ryan Lauer [R] | Rep. Donna Schaibley [R] | Rep. Dan Forestal [D] | Rep. Christy Stutzman [R] |
Sen. Greg Walker [R] | Sen. Andy Zay [R] | Sen. Eric Koch [R] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-18 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - Third reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - Third reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-01 | House | Public Law 181 |
2019-05-01 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2019-04-22 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2019-04-18 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 554: yeas 91, nays 0 |
2019-04-17 | House | Motion to concur filed |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 509: yeas 46, nays 0 |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2019-03-07 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Insurance and Financial Institutions |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2019-02-12 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Walker, Zay and Koch |
2019-02-12 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 144: yeas 92, nays 0 |
2019-02-11 | House | Representative Stutzman added as coauthor |
2019-02-11 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2019-02-07 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2019-01-29 | House | Representatives Schaibley and Forestal added as coauthors |
2019-01-24 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Financial Institutions |
2019-01-24 | House | Authored by Representative Lauer |