IN HB1660 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Enrolled on April 3 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-04-22 - Representative Hostettler added as conferee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Public works study. Urges the legislative council to assign to the interim study committee on government a study of the topic of certain statutory requirements of contractors on public works projects.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public works study. Urges the legislative council to assign to the interim study committee on government a study of the topic of certain statutory requirements of contractors on public works projects.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - Third reading (Y: 62 N: 29 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - Amendment #3 (Chyung) failed (Y: 32 N: 60 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2019-02-07 - House - Amendment #2 (Beck) failed (Y: 31 N: 62 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2019-02-05 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-22HouseRepresentative Hostettler added as conferee
2019-04-22HouseRepresentative Beck removed as conferee
2019-04-15SenateSenator Spartz added as advisor
2019-04-08SenateSenate advisors appointed: Garten and Ford J.D.
2019-04-08SenateSenate conferees appointed: Messmer and Niezgodski
2019-04-08HouseHouse advisors appointed: Bosma, Lyness, Bartlett, Deal and Moseley
2019-04-08HouseHouse conferees appointed: Goodrich and Beck
2019-04-04HouseHouse dissented from Senate amendments
2019-04-04HouseMotion to dissent filed
2019-04-03SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2019-04-02SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 381: yeas 48, nays 0
2019-04-01SenateSenator Randolph added as cosponsor
2019-04-01SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-03-28SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-03-18SenateSenator Messmer added as second sponsor
2019-03-07SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Pensions and Labor
2019-02-13HouseReferred to the Senate
2019-02-12HouseSenate sponsor: Senator Garten
2019-02-12HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 145: yeas 62, nays 29
2019-02-11HouseRepresentative Miller added as coauthor
2019-02-07HouseAmendment #3 (Chyung) failed; Roll Call 126: yeas 32, nays 60
2019-02-07HouseAmendment #2 (Beck) failed; Roll Call 125: yeas 31, nays 62
2019-02-07HouseAmendment #1 (Goodrich) prevailed; voice vote
2019-02-07HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2019-02-05HouseRepresentative Miller removed as coauthor
2019-02-05HouseRepresentative VanNatter added as coauthor
2019-02-05HouseRepresentative Goodrich added as author
2019-02-05HouseRepresentative Goodrich removed as coauthor
2019-02-05HouseRepresentative VanNatter removed as author
2019-02-05HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2019-01-24HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Employment, Labor and Pensions
2019-01-24HouseCoauthored by Representatives Goodrich and Miller D
2019-01-24HouseAuthored by Representative VanNatter

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2019/bills/house/1660/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/4/e/6/34e64e6c/HB1660.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/6/2/4/56245330/HB1660.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/d/5/3/cd53de2f/HB1660.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/b/d/b/dbdbb0fc/HB1660.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/a/7/4/ea74e6d5/HB1660.03.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/9/9/f/999f6f0b/HB1660.03.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/9/8/c/b98c779e/HB1660.04.COMS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/d/8/5/fd85846d/HB1660.01.INTR.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/3/f/b/03fb70b9/HB1660.125.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/c/1/f/fc1feda2/HB1660.145.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/9/7/6/997683a3/HB1660.126.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/4/d/d/44dd846e/HB1660.03.ENGH.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/c/f/7/acf754cc/HB1660.381.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback