IN HB1650 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-12 - Representative Clere added as coauthor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Elimination of township advisory boards. Amends various provisions in the Indiana Code concerning township government effective January 1, 2022. Provides that on January 1, 2020, in all counties (except Marion County): (1) township boards are dissolved; (2) the duties and responsibilities of the township board are transferred to the township trustee; (3) the township trustee has the legislative and fiscal powers and duties of the township, in addition to the executive powers and duties; and (4) the property and personnel of the township board are transferred to the township trustee. Beginning with property taxes due and payable in calendar year 2021 in a county not having a consolidated city, the township trustee shall submit the township budget to the county fiscal body for review and approval, if the township's proposed tax rate exceeds the statewide township property tax rate average during the preceding five years by at least 3% for property taxes due and payable that same year. Urges the legislative council to assign to an appropriate interim study committee the task of studying the effect of eliminating township advisory boards.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Elimination of township advisory boards. Amends various provisions in the Indiana Code concerning township government effective January 1, 2022. Provides that on January 1, 2020, in all counties (except Marion County): (1) township boards are dissolved; (2) the duties and responsibilities of the township board are transferred to the township trustee; (3) the township trustee has the legislative and fiscal powers and duties of the township, in addition to the executive powers and duties; and (4) the property and personnel of the township board are transferred to the township trustee. Beginning with property taxes due and payable in calendar year 2021 in a county not having a consolidated city, the township trustee shall submit the township budget to the county fiscal body for review and approval, if the township's proposed tax rate exceeds the statewide township property tax rate average during the preceding five years by at least 3% for property taxes due and payable that same year. Urges the legislative council to assign to an appropriate interim study committee the task of studying the effect of eliminating township advisory boards.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-12 - House - Third reading (Y: 18 N: 75 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2019-02-06 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-12HouseRepresentative Clere added as coauthor
2019-02-12HouseThird reading: defeated; Roll Call 147: yeas 18, nays 75
2019-02-11HouseAmendment #4 (Pryor) prevailed; Division of the House: yeas 50, nays 43
2019-02-11HouseAmendment #1 (Frye R) motion withdrawn
2019-02-11HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2019-02-07HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-01-24HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform
2019-01-24HouseAuthored by Representative Ziemke

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback