IN HB1644 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-12 - Public Law 35
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-12 - Public Law 35
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Study of applied behavior analysis issues. Urges the legislative council to assign to the appropriate study committee issues concerning: (1) the need to license individuals who practice applied behavior analysis; (2) independent centers that provide applied behavior analysis and the oversight that they receive to ensure their practices are current and fall under best practices and guidelines; and (3) the appropriate training and curriculum for teachers of students who attend kindergarten through grade 12 and receive special education services.
Title
Study of applied behavior analysis issues. Urges the legislative council to assign to the appropriate study committee issues concerning: (1) the need to license individuals who practice applied behavior analysis; (2) independent centers that provide applied behavior analysis and the oversight that they receive to ensure their practices are current and fall under best practices and guidelines; and (3) the appropriate training and curriculum for teachers of students who attend kindergarten through grade 12 and receive special education services.
Sponsors
Rep. Vanessa Summers [D] | Rep. Gerald Torr [R] | Rep. Alan Morrison [R] | Sen. Randall Head [R] |
Sen. David Niezgodski [D] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] | Sen. Mark Stoops [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-27 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-12 | House | Public Law 35 |
2017-04-12 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2017-04-06 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Returned to the House without amendments |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Senator Stoops added as cosponsor |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 297: yeas 49, nays 0 |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2017-02-23 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Commerce and Technology |
2017-02-21 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2017-02-20 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Head and Niezgodski |
2017-02-20 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 157: yeas 96, nays 0 |
2017-02-16 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2017-02-14 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2017-01-31 | House | Representatives Torr and Morrison added as coauthors |
2017-01-24 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Employment, Labor and Pensions |
2017-01-24 | House | Authored by Representative Summers |