IN HB1638 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Public Law 92
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Public Law 92
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
State fair. Reorganizes the state fair board (board) member districts. Provides for the transition and retention of current board members. Adds: (1) the director of the Purdue University cooperative extension service and an appointed member of the state fair board (board) as voting members of the state fair commission (commission); and (2) the chairperson and vice chairperson of the state fair advisory committee and a community representative as nonvoting members of the commission. Provides that not more than two members of the commission may be from the same district. Provides that the commission and the board shall ensure that the state fair (fair) is held annually. Specifies that the commission is responsible for all contracts related to the fair. Provides that statewide organizations may be certified by the department of agriculture (department) as eligible to vote in a state fair district election. Requires the department to maintain a list of organizations on the department's Internet web site that are certified to vote in a district election. Requires the director or an employee of the department designated by the director to preside over a district convention. Allows certain individuals to act as observers during the counting of the ballots. Requires the department, after the results of the election have been certified, to: (1) destroy the ballots; and (2) preserve the tally papers. Specifies responsibilities for the commission and board concerning the state fair and the fairgrounds. Repeals statutes concerning the center for agricultural science and heritage. Establishes the committee for agricultural science and heritage to advise the commission. Specifies that both the board and commission are state agencies for purposes of the Indiana tort claims act. Makes conforming changes.
Title
State fair. Reorganizes the state fair board (board) member districts. Provides for the transition and retention of current board members. Adds: (1) the director of the Purdue University cooperative extension service and an appointed member of the state fair board (board) as voting members of the state fair commission (commission); and (2) the chairperson and vice chairperson of the state fair advisory committee and a community representative as nonvoting members of the commission. Provides that not more than two members of the commission may be from the same district. Provides that the commission and the board shall ensure that the state fair (fair) is held annually. Specifies that the commission is responsible for all contracts related to the fair. Provides that statewide organizations may be certified by the department of agriculture (department) as eligible to vote in a state fair district election. Requires the department to maintain a list of organizations on the department's Internet web site that are certified to vote in a district election. Requires the director or an employee of the department designated by the director to preside over a district convention. Allows certain individuals to act as observers during the counting of the ballots. Requires the department, after the results of the election have been certified, to: (1) destroy the ballots; and (2) preserve the tally papers. Specifies responsibilities for the commission and board concerning the state fair and the fairgrounds. Repeals statutes concerning the center for agricultural science and heritage. Establishes the committee for agricultural science and heritage to advise the commission. Specifies that both the board and commission are state agencies for purposes of the Indiana tort claims act. Makes conforming changes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-10 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - Third reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - Third reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | House | Public Law 92 |
2019-04-24 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2019-04-11 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2019-04-10 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 481: yeas 92, nays 1 |
2019-04-10 | House | Motion to concur filed |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Senator Buck added as cosponsor |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 358: yeas 47, nays 0 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Senator Taylor G added as cosponsor |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Senator Glick added as third sponsor |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2019-03-07 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Agriculture |
2019-02-20 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2019-02-19 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Leising and Perfect |
2019-02-19 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 240: yeas 96, nays 0 |
2019-02-18 | House | Amendment #1 (Lehe) prevailed; voice vote |
2019-02-18 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2019-02-14 | House | Representative Klinker added as coauthor |
2019-02-14 | House | Rule 105.1 suspended |
2019-02-12 | House | Representative Torr added as coauthor |
2019-02-07 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2019-01-24 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Agriculture and Rural Development |
2019-01-24 | House | Coauthored by Representatives Cherry and Thompson |
2019-01-24 | House | Authored by Representative Lehe |