IN HB1637 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-07 - Public Law 222
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Various education issues. Reduces the number of members of the governing body of the school city of East Chicago from nine to five, beginning January 1, 2017. Provides that if a vacancy occurs on the governing body before January 1, 2017, the vacancy shall not be filled unless the vacancy reduces the number of members to fewer than five. Provides that three members of the governing body are elected from districts and two members of the governing body are elected at large by all the voters of the city. Repeals and provides for the expiration of statutes consistent with the

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Various education issues. Reduces the number of members of the governing body of the school city of East Chicago from nine to five, beginning January 1, 2017. Provides that if a vacancy occurs on the governing body before January 1, 2017, the vacancy shall not be filled unless the vacancy reduces the number of members to fewer than five. Provides that three members of the governing body are elected from districts and two members of the governing body are elected at large by all the voters of the city. Repeals and provides for the expiration of statutes consistent with the

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-29 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 45 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-09 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - Senate - Senate Committee on Education & Career Development - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - House Committee on Education - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-07HousePublic Law 222
2015-05-07HouseSigned by the Governor
2015-05-04SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2015-05-04SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2015-05-01HouseSigned by the Speaker
2015-04-29SenateRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 543: yeas 45, nays 3
2015-04-28HouseRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 563: yeas 97, nays 0
2015-04-15SenateSenate Advisors appointed: Kruse, Rogers and Raatz
2015-04-15SenateSenate Conferees appointed: Miller Pete and Stoops
2015-04-14HouseHouse Advisors appointed: Clere, Lucas, Austin, Errington and Moed
2015-04-14HouseHouse Conferees appointed: Behning and Smith V
2015-04-14HouseHouse dissented from Senate Amendments
2015-04-13HouseMotion to dissent filed
2015-04-10SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2015-04-09SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 408: yeas 48, nays 1
2015-04-07SenateAmendment #2 (Miller Pete) prevailed; voice vote
2015-04-07SenateAmendment #1 (Miller Pete) prevailed; voice vote
2015-04-07SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2015-03-31SenateSenator Randolph added as cosponsor
2015-03-26SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2015-03-02SenateFirst Reading: Referred to Committee on Education & Career Development
2015-02-25HouseReferred to the Senate
2015-02-24HouseSenator Rogers added as third sponsor
2015-02-24HouseSenator Kruse added as second sponsor
2015-02-24HouseSenator Miller, Pete added as sponsor
2015-02-24HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 258: yeas 94, nays 0
2015-02-23HouseRepresentatives Clere and Smith, V. added as coauthor
2015-02-23HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2015-02-19HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2015-01-22HouseFirst Reading: referred to Committee on Education
2015-01-22HouseAuthored by Representative Behning

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2015/bills/house/1637/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/0/4/d/b04d6516/HB1637.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/5/8/c/558c76a3/HB1637.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/8/6/f/686fe17b/HB1637.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/9/4/4/a944746f/HB1637.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/c/1/7/cc17a44e/HB1637.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/2/1/d/421d89de/HB1637.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/3/4/f/d34ff314/HB1637.04.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/5/7/7/7577c54d/HB1637.04.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/6/6/7/a6679307/HB1637.05.ENRH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/8/b/9/08b927c9/HB1637.01.INTR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/c/7/1/5c716f0d/HB1637.258.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/8/7/9/387963fa/HB1637.02.COMH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/3/b/6/c3b65cdd/HB1637.408.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/8/b/0/48b0eb85/HB1637.563.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/d/9/c/2d9c93b4/HB1637.543.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback