IN HB1636 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-07 - Public Law 221
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Charter schools. Provides that a governing body of a school corporation, a state educational institution, and a nonprofit college or university must register with the state board of education (state board) if it has not previously issued a charter for any charter school prior to July 1, 2015. Makes changes to the definition of an "organizer". Requires the state board to provide a formal evaluation of the overall state of charter school outcomes in Indiana every five years. Provides that a charter school may give enrollment preference to children of the charter school's founders, governing body members, and charter school

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Charter schools. Provides that a governing body of a school corporation, a state educational institution, and a nonprofit college or university must register with the state board of education (state board) if it has not previously issued a charter for any charter school prior to July 1, 2015. Makes changes to the definition of an "organizer". Requires the state board to provide a formal evaluation of the overall state of charter school outcomes in Indiana every five years. Provides that a charter school may give enrollment preference to children of the charter school's founders, governing body members, and charter school

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-23 - House - House - House reconsidered and concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 74 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-04-09 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 36 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - Senate - Senate Committee on Education & Career Development - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 82 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - House - House - Amendment #5 (Smith V) failed (Y: 24 N: 69 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2015-02-16 - House - House - Amendment #10 (Austin) prevailed (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House Committee on Education - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-07HousePublic Law 221
2015-05-07HouseSigned by the Governor
2015-05-04SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2015-04-29SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2015-04-29HouseSigned by the Speaker
2015-04-23HouseHouse reconsidered and concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 524: yeas 74, nays 17
2015-04-23HouseMotion to concur filed
2015-04-15SenateSenate Advisors appointed: Yoder, Mrvan and Kenley
2015-04-15SenateSenate Conferees appointed: Kruse and Rogers
2015-04-14HouseHouse Advisors appointed: Cook, Fine, Austin, Errington and Moed
2015-04-14HouseHouse Conferees appointed: Behning and Smith V
2015-04-14HouseHouse dissented from Senate Amendments
2015-04-13HouseMotion to dissent filed
2015-04-10SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2015-04-09SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 407: yeas 36, nays 13
2015-04-07SenateAmendment #1 (Stoops) failed; voice vote
2015-04-07SenateAmendment #2 (Kruse) prevailed; voice vote
2015-04-07SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2015-03-26SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2015-02-24SenateFirst Reading: Referred to Committee on Education & Career Development
2015-02-19HouseReferred to the Senate
2015-02-17HouseSenator Yoder added as second sponsor
2015-02-17HouseSenator Kruse added as sponsor
2015-02-17HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 175: yeas 82, nays 12
2015-02-16HouseAmendment #5 (Smith V) failed; Roll Call 150: yeas 24, nays 69
2015-02-16HouseAmendment #10 (Austin) prevailed; Roll Call 149: yeas 93, nays 0
2015-02-16HouseAmendment #11 (Behning) prevailed; voice vote
2015-02-16HouseReread second time: amended, ordered engrossed
2015-02-12HouseSecond reading: call withdrawn
2015-02-10HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2015-01-22HouseFirst Reading: referred to Committee on Education
2015-01-22HouseCoauthored by Representative Moed
2015-01-22HouseAuthored by Representative Behning

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2015/bills/house/1636/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/3/4/d/934daab8/HB1636.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/d/7/e/3d7e9c01/HB1636.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/3/2/a/332a1bf9/HB1636.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/f/9/0/0f9055c5/HB1636.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/4/3/0/043039ac/HB1636.03.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/a/f/1/9af18d6c/HB1636.03.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/3/7/6/a376d5f3/HB1636.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/0/3/9/70396fb6/HB1636.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/4/f/1/f4f121a5/HB1636.05.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/3/3/d/433de4b9/HB1636.05.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/7/7/2/077293ec/HB1636.06.ENRH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/b/f/9/bbf95154/HB1636.01.INTR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/1/2/0/1120f7bb/HB1636.149.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/b/c/b/8bcb25b3/HB1636.150.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/4/3/2/a43249aa/HB1636.175.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/2/9/9/1299cb34/HB1636.03.ENGH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/f/9/3/7f93ecfc/HB1636.407.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/9/0/8/49088497/HB1636.524.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback