IN HB1631 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-06 - Public Law 288
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Short term insurance plans. Specifies certain coverage and disclosures that must be provided with respect to a short term insurance plan, including renewal, without underwriting, for the greater of 36 months or the maximum period permitted under federal law, a term of not more than 364 days, and an annual limit of at least $2,000,000. Specifies requirements for preferred provider organizations used with short term insurance plans. Makes conforming amendments.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Short term insurance plans. Specifies certain coverage and disclosures that must be provided with respect to a short term insurance plan, including renewal, without underwriting, for the greater of 36 months or the maximum period permitted under federal law, a term of not more than 364 days, and an annual limit of at least $2,000,000. Specifies requirements for preferred provider organizations used with short term insurance plans. Makes conforming amendments.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-24 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 68 N: 29 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 26 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #1 (Ford J.D.) prevailed (Y: 40 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-06HousePublic Law 288
2019-05-06HouseSigned by the Governor
2019-04-30SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-04-29SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2019-04-29HouseSigned by the Speaker
2019-04-24HouseRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 634: yeas 68, nays 29
2019-04-24SenateRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 609: yeas 26, nays 23
2019-04-24SenateCCR # 1 filed in the Senate
2019-04-24HouseCCR # 1 filed in the House
2019-04-23HouseRepresentative Lehman added as conferee
2019-04-23HouseRepresentative Austin removed as conferee
2019-04-23HouseRepresentative Lehman removed as advisor
2019-04-23SenateSenator Gaskill added as conferee
2019-04-23SenateSenator Ford J.D. removed as conferee
2019-04-23SenateSenator Gaskill removed as advisor
2019-04-18SenateSenate advisors appointed: Houchin, Breaux and Gaskill
2019-04-18SenateSenate conferees appointed: Walker and Ford J.D.
2019-04-18HouseHouse advisors appointed: Lehman, Borders and Campbell
2019-04-18HouseHouse conferees appointed: Carbaugh and Austin
2019-04-17HouseHouse dissented from Senate amendments
2019-04-17HouseMotion to dissent filed
2019-04-17SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2019-04-16SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 504: yeas 48, nays 1
2019-04-15SenateAmendment #1 (Ford J.D.) prevailed; Roll Call 466: yeas 40, nays 9
2019-04-15SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2019-04-11SenateSenator Gaskill added as second sponsor
2019-04-11SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-03-07SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Insurance and Financial Institutions
2019-02-20HouseReferred to the Senate
2019-02-19HouseSenate sponsor: Senator Walker
2019-02-19HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 239: yeas 95, nays 0
2019-02-18HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-02-14HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-02-12HouseRepresentative Austin added as coauthor
2019-01-24HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Insurance
2019-01-24HouseAuthored by Representative Carbaugh

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2019/bills/house/1631/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/4/6/5/14659cfa/HB1631.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/6/b/0/46b01bd1/HB1631.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/6/8/1/4681ac4b/HB1631.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/0/1/4/70145c2d/HB1631.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/6/7/3/3673458e/HB1631.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/a/3/c/2a3c1f70/HB1631.04.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/4/1/e/741eaca8/HB1631.04.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/a/4/d/2a4d294a/HB1631.05.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/e/e/e/feeee7c0/HB1631.01.INTR.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/2/6/8/d268a874/HB1631.239.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/3/4/0/f3403cd4/HB1631.02.COMH.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/7/9/9/c7997a92/HB1631.466.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/9/2/0/d920206c/HB1631.504.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/5/4/2/8542234d/HB1631.609.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/9/f/a/29fa7e8e/HB1631.634.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback