IN HB1631 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on May 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-05 - Public Law 197
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on May 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-05 - Public Law 197
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Identification cards without an image. Requires the bureau of motor vehicles to issue a photo exempt identification card (card) that does not bear the image of the holder. Requires that an application for a card, among other requirements, must contain a digital image of the applicant. Provides that an individual may not have a card and a driver's license or identification card at a time. Provides that a retailer that in good faith accepts a card as proof of identification for a retail transaction is immune from civil liability that may occur as a result of the acceptance. Sets a
Title
Identification cards without an image. Requires the bureau of motor vehicles to issue a photo exempt identification card (card) that does not bear the image of the holder. Requires that an application for a card, among other requirements, must contain a digital image of the applicant. Provides that an individual may not have a card and a driver's license or identification card at a time. Provides that a retailer that in good faith accepts a card as proof of identification for a retail transaction is immune from civil liability that may occur as a result of the acceptance. Sets a
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Morris [R] | Rep. Greg Beumer [R] | Rep. Matthew Lehman [R] | Rep. David Ober [R] |
Sen. Travis Holdman [R] | Sen. Carlin Yoder [R] | Sen. Dennis Kruse [R] | Sen. James Arnold [D] |
Sen. Susan Glick [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-26 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 37 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-17 - Senate - Senate Committee on Homeland Security & Transportation - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 82 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - House - House Committee on Roads and Transportation - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-17 - Senate - Senate Committee on Homeland Security & Transportation - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 82 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - House - House Committee on Roads and Transportation - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-05 | House | Public Law 197 |
2015-05-05 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2015-05-01 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Joint Rule 20 technical correction adopted by the Senate |
2015-04-29 | House | Joint Rule 20 technical correction adopted by the House |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Returned to the House without amendments |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 340: yeas 37, nays 13 |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Senator Glick added as cosponsor |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Senator Arnold added as cosponsor |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2015-02-24 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to Committee on Homeland Security & Transportation |
2015-02-17 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2015-02-16 | House | Senator Kruse added as third sponsor |
2015-02-16 | House | Senator Yoder added as second sponsor |
2015-02-16 | House | Senator Holdman added as sponsor |
2015-02-16 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 139: yeas 82, nays 14 |
2015-02-12 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2015-01-29 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2015-01-26 | House | Representative Lehman and Ober added as coauthor |
2015-01-22 | House | First Reading: referred to Committee on Roads and Transportation |
2015-01-22 | House | Coauthored by Representative Beumer |
2015-01-22 | House | Authored by Representative Morris |