IN HB1627 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Public Law 159
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Sale of tax sale properties to nonprofits. Provides that a tax sale statute concerning the sale of real property to eligible nonprofit entities for low or moderate income housing applies to all counties. (Current law provides that the provision only applies to a county having a consolidated city.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sale of tax sale properties to nonprofits.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-04-18 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 91 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-04-10 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-01HousePublic Law 159
2023-05-01HouseSigned by the Governor
2023-04-26SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2023-04-21SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2023-04-21HouseSigned by the Speaker
2023-04-18HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 451: yeas 91, nays 2
2023-04-13HouseMotion to concur filed
2023-04-11SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2023-04-10SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 346: yeas 49, nays 0
2023-04-06SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2023-04-04SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2023-03-28SenatePursuant to Senate Rule 68(b); reassigned to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy
2023-03-20SenateSenator Pol added as cosponsor
2023-03-20SenateSenator Mishler added as cosponsor
2023-03-20SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2023-03-01SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Local Government
2023-02-21HouseReferred to the Senate
2023-02-20HouseSenate sponsors: Senators Rogers, Niezgodski, Young M
2023-02-20HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 157: yeas 96, nays 1
2023-02-16HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2023-02-14HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2023-02-09HouseRepresentative Teshka J added as coauthor
2023-02-06HouseRepresentative May added as coauthor
2023-01-19HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Local Government
2023-01-19HouseAuthored by Representative Bauer M
2023-01-19HouseCoauthored by Representative Moed

Subjects


Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback