IN HB1625 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-07 - First reading: referred to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy
Pending: Senate Tax and Fiscal Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Housing cost information. Amends the statute concerning state rulemaking procedures to provide that if a state agency intends to adopt a rule that may increase or decrease the costs of housing in Indiana, the agency shall prepare a housing impact analysis (analysis) for the rule. Provides that: (1) the full text of the analysis must be published in the Indiana Register; and (2) the rule must be referenced in the required newspaper notice of the rule; under state rulemaking procedures. Requires a county or a municipality to prepare an analysis if a proposed regulation may increase or decrease the cost of housing in the county or municipality. Requires the analysis to be submitted to the members of the legislative body not less than 30 days before the legislative body considers the regulation. Sets forth the required information for an analysis prepared by a state agency or by a county or municipality. Requires the Indiana housing and community development authority (authority) to prepare a comprehensive five year state housing strategy plan (plan). Sets forth required elements of the plan. Requires the authority to: (1) annually update the plan; and (2) submit the plan to the governor and the legislative council before October 1 of each year. Requires a municipality to annually prepare a housing fee report. Requires the municipality to post the report on the municipality's Internet web site (or on the county's Internet web site if the municipality does not maintain an Internet web site). Provides that a municipality may not impose any housing related fee that is not: (1) included in the fee report; or (2) posted on the municipality's Internet web site.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Housing cost information. Amends the statute concerning state rulemaking procedures to provide that if a state agency intends to adopt a rule that may increase or decrease the costs of housing in Indiana, the agency shall prepare a housing impact analysis (analysis) for the rule. Provides that: (1) the full text of the analysis must be published in the Indiana Register; and (2) the rule must be referenced in the required newspaper notice of the rule; under state rulemaking procedures. Requires a county or a municipality to prepare an analysis if a proposed regulation may increase or decrease the cost of housing in the county or municipality. Requires the analysis to be submitted to the members of the legislative body not less than 30 days before the legislative body considers the regulation. Sets forth the required information for an analysis prepared by a state agency or by a county or municipality. Requires the Indiana housing and community development authority (authority) to prepare a comprehensive five year state housing strategy plan (plan). Sets forth required elements of the plan. Requires the authority to: (1) annually update the plan; and (2) submit the plan to the governor and the legislative council before October 1 of each year. Requires a municipality to annually prepare a housing fee report. Requires the municipality to post the report on the municipality's Internet web site (or on the county's Internet web site if the municipality does not maintain an Internet web site). Provides that a municipality may not impose any housing related fee that is not: (1) included in the fee report; or (2) posted on the municipality's Internet web site.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-21 - House - Third reading (Y: 52 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - Amendment #1 (Clere) prevailed (Y: 85 N: 8 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-07SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy
2019-02-22HouseReferred to the Senate
2019-02-21HouseSenate sponsors: Senators Messmer and Garten
2019-02-21HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 266: yeas 52, nays 47
2019-02-14HouseAmendment #2 (Clere) prevailed; voice vote
2019-02-14HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2019-02-12HousePlaced back on second reading
2019-02-05HouseAmendment #1 (Clere) prevailed; Roll Call 95: yeas 85, nays 8
2019-02-05HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2019-01-31HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-01-29HouseRepresentatives Eberhart, Hatfield, Manning added as coauthors
2019-01-22HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform
2019-01-22HouseAuthored by Representative Clere

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2019/bills/house/1625/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/2/3/1/a2318a51/HB1625.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/2/7/5/32758462/HB1625.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/a/6/0/3a6026ff/HB1625.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/a/b/c/4abcbb3b/HB1625.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/d/2/f/0d2f71f7/HB1625.03.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/e/b/7/4eb79ee9/HB1625.03.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/8/7/f/987fa444/HB1625.04.ENGH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/9/2/6/6926067e/HB1625.01.INTR.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/1/a/d/91adbbc2/HB1625.95.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/2/1/5/b215faa7/HB1625.266.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback