IN HB1624 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-19 - Amendment #1 (McMillin) failed; Roll Call 185: yeas 45, nays 47
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-19 - Amendment #1 (McMillin) failed; Roll Call 185: yeas 45, nays 47
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Sale of alcoholic beverages. Provides that a holder of an alcoholic beverage permit who is authorized by law to sell alcoholic beverages for carryout may sell alcoholic beverages for carryout on Sunday from 7 a.m., prevailing local time, until 3 a.m., prevailing local time, the following day. Requires alcoholic beverage sales in a drug store or grocery store to be rung up by a sales clerk and liquor in a drug store to be accessed by a sales clerk who: (1) has an employee permit; and (2) has alcohol server training. Provides that the provision that allows individuals who are
Title
Sale of alcoholic beverages. Provides that a holder of an alcoholic beverage permit who is authorized by law to sell alcoholic beverages for carryout may sell alcoholic beverages for carryout on Sunday from 7 a.m., prevailing local time, until 3 a.m., prevailing local time, the following day. Requires alcoholic beverage sales in a drug store or grocery store to be rung up by a sales clerk and liquor in a drug store to be accessed by a sales clerk who: (1) has an employee permit; and (2) has alcohol server training. Provides that the provision that allows individuals who are
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-19 - House - House - Amendment #1 (McMillin) failed (Y: 45 N: 47 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2015-02-11 - House - House Committee on Public Policy - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - House Committee on Public Policy - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-19 | House | Amendment #1 (McMillin) failed; Roll Call 185: yeas 45, nays 47 |
2015-02-19 | House | Amendment #7 (Smith M) failed; Division of the House: yeas 31, nays 55 |
2015-02-19 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2015-02-12 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2015-02-10 | House | Representative GiaQuinta added as coauthor |
2015-01-22 | House | First Reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy |
2015-01-22 | House | Coauthored by Representatives Eberhart and Austin |
2015-01-22 | House | Authored by Representative Dermody |