IN HB1615 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 41-14)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-17 - Representative Judy added as coauthor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-17 - Representative Judy added as coauthor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Veterans' recovery program. Establishes, for five years, the veterans' recovery program and fund to provide treatment for veterans with traumatic brain injury or posttraumatic stress disorder and to obtain reimbursement from third parties. Requires the commissioner of insurance to establish program standards. Allows the commissioner to appoint an advisory board for the program. Requires annual reporting. Makes an appropriation.
Title
Veterans' recovery program. Establishes, for five years, the veterans' recovery program and fund to provide treatment for veterans with traumatic brain injury or posttraumatic stress disorder and to obtain reimbursement from third parties. Requires the commissioner of insurance to establish program standards. Allows the commissioner to appoint an advisory board for the program. Requires annual reporting. Makes an appropriation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-11 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-17 | House | Representative Judy added as coauthor |
2015-02-17 | House | Representatives Bosma, Bacon, Kirchhofer, Behning, Davisson, Frizzell, Lehe, Slager, Brown, C., Porter, Shackleford, Pelath, Harris, Kersey, DeLaney, Macer, Ober, Harman, Leonard, Smaltz, Steuerwald, Washburne, Mayfield, Price, Arnold, Lucas, Gutwein, Baird, Soliday, Aylesworth, Frye, Smith, M., Cherry, VanNatter, Beumer, Burton, DeVon, Hamm, McNamara, Miller, Rhoads, Cook, Riecken, Forestal, Moed, Torr, Ubelhor, Clere, Morris added as coauthors |
2015-02-17 | House | Representative Lawson added as coauthor |
2015-02-17 | House | Rule 105.1 suspended |
2015-02-12 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127 |
2015-02-12 | House | Representative Hale added as coauthor |
2015-02-12 | House | Representative Carbaugh added as coauthor |
2015-02-12 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2015-02-02 | House | Reassigned to committee on Public Health |
2015-01-22 | House | First Reading: referred to Committee on Veterans Affairs and Public Safety |
2015-01-22 | House | Representative Moseley added as coauthor |
2015-01-22 | House | Authored by Representative Zent |